EP3828954 - CONTAINMENT STRUCTURE FOR A BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19275130.3 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828954 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/04 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H01M10/0481 (EP);
H01M50/20 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERSTRUKTUR FÜR EINE BATTERIE | [2021/22] | English: | CONTAINMENT STRUCTURE FOR A BATTERY | [2021/22] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CONFINEMENT POUR BATTERIE | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN203760543U (NINGBO DACHENG ADVANCED MATERIAL CO LTD) [X] 1-5,12,13 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-2; claims 1-6 * [I] 6-11; | [XI]CN205890037U (HUIZHOU HILONG MOULD AND PLASTIC PRODUCE CO LTD) [X] 1-7,9-11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3; claims 1-9 * [I] 8,12,13; | [A]WO2016032651 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-21 *; | [A]US2019165346 (WALLACE JASON [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-19 * |