EP3712739 - A VOLTAGE REFERENCE CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin TX 78735 / US | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SICARD, Thierry Michel Alain NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing 134 av Eisenhower BP 72329 31023 Toulouse cedex 1 / FR | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Schmütz, Christian Klaus Johannes NXP Semiconductors Germany GmbH Intellectual Property Group Beiersdorfstr. 12 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2024/40] |
Former [2020/39] | Bradler, Carola Romana NXP Semiconductors Germany GmbH Intellectual Property Group Troplowitzstraße 20 22529 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19305354.3 | 22.03.2019 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712739 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3712739 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/30 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G05F3/30 (EP,US);
G05F1/567 (CN);
G05F3/265 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2020/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSREFERENZSCHALTUNG | [2020/39] | English: | A VOLTAGE REFERENCE CIRCUIT | [2020/39] | French: | CIRCUIT DE RÉFÉRENCE DE TENSION | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4249122 (WIDLAR ROBERT J); | [A]DE3321556 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2263794 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2016274617 (WADHWA SANJAY KUMAR [IN]) |