EP3763406 - METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR ACQUIRING DELIVERY INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Weilnau, Carsten Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | Weilnau, Carsten Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 19305934.2 | 12.07.2019 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763406 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
A61M5/31541 (EP,US);
A61M5/20 (CN,US);
A61M5/31 (CN);
A61M5/3129 (CN,US);
A61M5/31528 (CN,US);
A61M5/31533 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN VON LIEFERINFORMATIONEN | [2021/02] | English: | METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR ACQUIRING DELIVERY INFORMATION | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR L'ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS DE DISTRIBUTION | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2015091818 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [ID] 1-13 * abstract * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]WO2015185687 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO2017147202 (WEST PHARMACEUTICAL SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]WO2018078161 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 5 * * page 22, lines 1-7 * | by applicant | DE2017081 | WO2015091818 | WO2018EP82640 |