EP3796516 - CONTROLLING A WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EnerSys Delaware Inc. 2366 Bernville Road Reading, PA 19605 / US | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRELIVET, Damien 3 Rue Jean Bodel Batiment B 62000 Arras / FR | 02 /
ROUDAUT, Maxime 103 bis Avenue Fernand Lobbedez App 11 bat A 62000 Arras / FR | 03 /
DEHEM, Patrick 24 bis Rue Renault 62490 Vitry en Artois / FR | 04 /
GORI, Paul Antoine Appt 6 - 4, Rue du Saumon 62000 Arras / FR | 05 /
LETOMBE, David 169 Avenue JF Kennedy 62000 Arras / FR | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19306168.6 | 23.09.2019 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796516 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/12 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J7/04 (US);
H02J2207/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINES DRAHTLOSEN LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMS | [2021/12] | English: | CONTROLLING A WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM | [2021/12] | French: | COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 14.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2924841 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP], et al); | [XI]US2018342878 (NAGAOKA SHIRO [JP]) |