EP3797846 - MICROFLUIDIC EXTRACTION FROM PLANT EXTRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chanel Parfums Beauté 135 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [2024/21] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states Chanel Parfums Beauté 135 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RILHAC, Vincent 8 rue du Cheval Blanc CS 40045 93694 PANTIN CEDEX / FR | 02 /
TORIBIO, ALIX 8 rue du Cheval Blanc CS 40045 93694 PANTIN CEDEX / FR | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19306206.4 | 26.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797846 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3797846 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/105, A23F5/48, B01D11/04 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B01D11/0496 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D11/0484 (EP,KR,US);
A23F5/48 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,KR,US);
B01D11/0492 (EP,KR,US);
C11B3/006 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | B01D11/04, A23F5/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDEXTRAKTION AUS EINEM PFLANZENEXTRAKT | [2021/13] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC EXTRACTION FROM PLANT EXTRACT | [2021/13] | French: | EXTRACTION MICROFLUIDIQUE A PARTIR D'EXTRAIT VEGETAL | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 16.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9612541 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 10 * figure 14 * * page 19, lines 28-33 *; | [A]CN206372553U (GUIZHOU VCGUO CO LTD) [A] 1-10* figure -; claim - *; | [XYI] - QIN WEIWEI ET AL, "A successive laminar flow extraction for plant medicine preparation by microfluidic chip", MICROFLUIDICS AND NANOFLUIDICS, SPRINGER, DE, vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S10404-019-2228-8, ISSN 1613-4982, (20190330), pages 1 - 8, (20190330), XP036755521 [X] 1-3,5-9 * page 2 - page 4 * * figure -; table - * [Y] 10 [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10404-019-2228-8 | [XYI] - XUAN MU ET AL, "Selectively modified microfluidic chip for solvent extraction of Radix Salvia Miltiorrhiza using three-phase laminar flow to provide double liquid-liquid interface area", MICROFLUIDICS AND NANOFLUIDICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20091224), vol. 9, no. 2-3, ISSN 1613-4990, pages 365 - 373, XP019811137 [X] 1-3,5-10 * page 366 - page 368 * * figure - * * page 370 * * page 371 * [Y] 10 [I] 4 | [XYI] - KISHORE K. R. TETALA ET AL, "A three-phase microfluidic chip for rapid sample clean-up of alkaloids from plant extracts", LAB ON A CHIP, (20090101), vol. 9, no. 14, doi:10.1039/b822106e, ISSN 1473-0197, page 2085, XP055676624 [X] 1-3,5-9 * page 2086 - page 2088 * * figure - * [Y] 10 [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b822106e | Examination | US6355693 | - GONÇALVES DANIEL ET AL, "Fractionation of orange essential oil using liquid-liquid extraction: Equilibrium data for model and real systems at 298", FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150428), vol. 399, doi:10.1016/J.FLUID.2015.04.022, ISSN 0378-3812, pages 87 - 97, XP029242301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fluid.2015.04.022 | - Koshima Cristina C. ET AL, "Fractionation of Bergamot and Lavandin Crude Essential Oils by Solvent Extraction: Phase Equilibrium at 298.2 K", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING DATA., US, (20141219), vol. 60, no. 1, doi:10.1021/je500581h, ISSN 0021-9568, pages 37 - 46, XP093031819 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/je500581h | - Arce Alberto ET AL, "Citrus Essential Oil Deterpenation by Liquid-Liquid Extraction", Canadian Journal of Chemical Engineering, (20050401), vol. 83, no. 2, doi:10.1002/cjce.5450830226, ISSN 0008-4034, pages 366 - 370, XP093031825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cjce.5450830226 |