EP3817454 - SWITCHING A SIDELINK FROM A SOURCE CELL TO A TARGET CELL USING A FALLBACK LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk Amsterdam / NL | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNEVILLE, Hervé C/ Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu - CS10806 35708 RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | 02 /
GRESSET, Nicolas C/ Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu - CS10806 35708 RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | 03 /
KHANFOUCI, Mourad C/ Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu - CS10806 35708 RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | 04 /
CIOCHINA, Cristina C/ Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe 1 allée de Beaulieu - CS10806 35708 RENNES Cedex 7 / FR | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19306414.4 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817454 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04W36/00, H04W36/14, H04W36/18, // H04W88/06 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP,CN);
H04W36/0072 (EP,CN);
H04W36/03 (US);
H04W36/0033 (CN);
H04W36/00837 (US);
H04W36/037 (EP,CN);
H04W36/144 (EP,CN);
H04W36/18 (EP,CN);
H04W36/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | H04W36/14, H04W76/14, // H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMSCHALTUNG EINER SEITENVERBINDUNG VON EINER URSPRUNGSZELLE ZU EINER ZIELZELLE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER RÜCKFALLVERBINDUNG | [2021/18] | English: | SWITCHING A SIDELINK FROM A SOURCE CELL TO A TARGET CELL USING A FALLBACK LINK | [2021/18] | French: | COMMUTATION D'UN LIAISON SECONDAIRE D'UNE CELLULE SOURCE À UNE CELLULE CIBLE À L'AIDE D'UNE LIAISON DE RETOUR | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 11.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2018202798 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [I] 1-16 * page 12, line 24 - page 15, line 20 * * page 27, line 4 - line 16 * * page 72, line 17 - page 74, line 8 * * figures 11a,11b,15 *; | [A]US2019182700 (KIM SOYOUNG [KR]) [A] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] ** figure 8 *; | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Correction on V2X sidelink communication in TS 36.300", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20181012 - 20181016, (20181209), 3GPP DRAFT; 36300_CR1199R2_(REL-15)_R2-1816470_CORRECTION ON V2X SIDELINK COMMUNICATION IN TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN/Docs/RP%2D182678%2Ezip, (20181209), XP051553727 [A] 1-16 *Chapter 23.14.1.1 Support for V2X sidelink communication* | [A] - ZTE, "Considerations on mobility enhancements for V2V", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-163820_CONSIDERATIONS ON MOBILITY ENHANCEMENTS FOR V2V, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051105226 [A] 1,14,15 *Chapter 2.1 PC5 interruption time in handover case* |