EP3815969 - SEWER-CLEANING VEHICLE COMPRISING AN OPTIMISED STORAGE TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huwer Holding 9 place Jules Nadi 26100 Romans-sur-Isere / FR | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVICE, Jean-Michel Les Garennes 72200 BAZOUGES-SUR-LE-LOIR / FR | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Gauchet, Fabien Roland Brandon IP 64, rue Tiquetonne 75002 Paris / FR | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19306425.0 | 04.11.2019 | [2021/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3815969 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3815969 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/22, E03F7/10, // B65D90/54, B65D90/58, B65D88/12 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
B60P3/2205 (EP);
B65D90/54 (CN);
B60P3/226 (EP);
B65D90/00 (CN);
E03F7/10 (EP);
B65D88/128 (EP);
B65D90/582 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | B60P3/22, E03F7/10, // B65D90/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROHRREINIGUNGSFAHRZEUG, DAS EINEN OPTIMIERTEN SPEICHERTANK UMFASST | [2021/18] | English: | SEWER-CLEANING VEHICLE COMPRISING AN OPTIMISED STORAGE TANK | [2021/18] | French: | VEHICULE HYDROCUREUR COMPORTANT UNE CITERNE DE STOCKAGE OPTIMISEE | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 27.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014017018 (BLAIS DENIS [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * figures 1,2,5,6 * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [XA]US9528259 (BOSSOM BERNIE JON [US]) [X] 1,3,6-9 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 19 - line 65 * [A] 4; | [I]US2018104622 (DAWSON WILLIAM [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5-9 * figures 9-14,18 ** paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0092] *; | [A]US2018313131 (MATYE REINHARD [US]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1-8 * |