EP3825229 - PROPULSION SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN AIRCRAFT, AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A PROPULSION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SELECTIVELY ADAPTING AN ENERGY SUPPLY WITHIN A PROPULSION SYSTEM OF AN ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS HELICOPTERS DEUTSCHLAND GmbH Industriestraße 4 86609 Donauwörth / DE | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space SA Avenida John Lennon s/n 28906 Getafe Madrid / ES | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19380031.5 | 19.11.2019 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825229 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/08, B64C27/20, B64C39/00, B64D27/24, B64D31/06, B64D31/14, B64D35/00, B64D31/10, B64D35/04 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
B64D27/24 (EP);
B64D31/10 (EP);
B64D35/04 (EP);
B64D2221/00 (EP);
Y02T50/40 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCH ANGETRIEBENES FLUGZEUG, FLUGZEUG MIT ANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN ANPASSUNG EINER ENERGIEVERSORGUNG IN EINEM ANTRIEBSSYSTEM EINES ELEKTRISCH ANGETRIEBENEN FLUGZEUGS | [2021/21] | English: | PROPULSION SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN AIRCRAFT, AIRCRAFT COMPRISING A PROPULSION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SELECTIVELY ADAPTING AN ENERGY SUPPLY WITHIN A PROPULSION SYSTEM OF AN ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN AIRCRAFT | [2021/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION POUR UN AÉRONEF À PROPULSION ÉLECTRIQUE, AÉRONEF COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION ET PROCÉDÉ D'ADAPTATION SÉLECTIVE D'UNE ALIMENTATION D' ÉNERGIE À UN SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION D'UN AÉRONEF À PROPULSION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2021/44] | 21.06.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3103670 (ROLLS-ROYCE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,15 * the whole document * [I] 4,8,14; | [X]EP3296212 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2720945 | US2016137305 |