EP3683170 - PACK OF INSULATING PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states URSA Insulation, S.A. Paseo de Recoletos, 3 28004 Madrid / ES | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORRIJOS HIJÓN, Miguel Ángel URSA Insulation S.A. c/Narciso Serra 5 esc. Exterior - 4 centro 28007 Madrid / ES | 02 /
CASADO DOMÍNGUEZ, Arturo Luís URSA Insulation S.A. C/ Marte 28 28680 Paracuellos del Jarama (Madrid) / ES | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Hoffmann Eitle S.L.U. Paseo de la Castellana 140, 3a planta Edificio LIMA 28046 Madrid / ES | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 19382033.9 | 18.01.2019 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683170 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/07 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
B65D85/07 (EP);
B65D71/0088 (EP);
B65D85/62 (EP);
B65D2571/00018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMMPLATTENPAKET | [2020/30] | English: | PACK OF INSULATING PANELS | [2020/30] | French: | LOT DE PANNEAUX ISOLANTS | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 19.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/37] | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2022 | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2460738 (SAINT GOBAIN ECOPHON AB [SE]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0025] , [0046] - [0052] - [0076] - [0077] - [0085]; figures 1,8,11 * | by applicant | WO2007014236 | WO2008053332 | WO2009080938 | US2009275699 | WO2010029266 | WO2012118939 | WO2013014399 | EP2657266 | EP2657203 | EP2635502 | WO2015040024 | EP2865799 | WO2015132518 | WO2018007231 | EP3315470 |