EP3764503 - POWER CONVERTER CONTROL AND OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España S.L. C/ Roc Boronat, 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANCHEZ NAVARRO, Javier Roc Boronat 78 08005 BARCELONA / ES | 02 /
RICCHIUTO, Domenico Roc Boronat 78 08005 BARCELONA / ES | 03 /
MANDRIOLI, Leonardo Viale Cirene 20 20135 MILANO / IT | 04 /
CAUBET BUSQUET, Oriol Roc Boronat 78 08005 BARCELONA / ES | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg S.L., et al Avenida Diagonal 598, 3º, 1ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | de Rooij, Mathieu Julien, et al Bardehle Pagenberg S.L. Avenida Diagonal 598, 3° 1ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2021/02] | de Rooij, Mathieu Julien, et al Bardehle Pagenberg S.L. Avenida Diagonal 420, 1° 1ª 08037 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 19382586.6 | 09.07.2019 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764503 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3764503 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/24, H02J3/48, // F03D7/02, F03D9/25 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
F03D7/0272 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,CN);
F03D7/0284 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (US);
H02J3/241 (EP);
H02J3/466 (CN);
H02J3/48 (EP,CN,US);
H02P9/00 (CN);
F03D7/0224 (EP);
F05B2270/337 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,CN);
H02P2101/15 (CN);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMWANDLERSTEUERUNG UND -BETRIEB | [2021/02] | English: | POWER CONVERTER CONTROL AND OPERATION | [2021/02] | French: | COMMANDE ET FONCTIONNEMENT DE CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2024
03.06.2024
ADMISSIBLE Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2024/28] | 14.06.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010002402 (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2010320762 (LETAS HEINZ-HERMANN [DE], et al); | [A]EP2360375 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]); | [A]EP2706643 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | Opposition | WO2005031160 | WO2012076014 | WO2012146250 | DE102016120700 |