EP3636464 - LIFTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE AXLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accesorios y Elevadores Valencia, S.L. C/ Barranc Pascual, 23 Pol. Ind. Campo Anibal 46530 Puzol (Valencia) / ES | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORENO IBAÑEZ, Alberto Barranc Pascual, 23 Pol. Ind. Campo Anibal 46530 Puzol / ES | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 19382854.8 | 03.10.2019 | [2020/16] | Priority number, date | ES20180031517U | 04.10.2018 Original published format: ES 201831517 U | [2020/16] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636464 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3636464 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60G11/46, B62D61/12, B60G7/04, B60G9/00 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
B60G11/465 (EP);
B60G7/04 (EP);
B60G9/003 (EP);
B60G2200/31 (EP);
B60G2202/412 (EP);
B60G2204/4302 (EP);
B60G2204/4702 (EP);
B60G2206/601 (EP);
B60G2300/402 (EP);
B62D61/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGACHSE | [2020/16] | English: | LIFTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE AXLE | [2020/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE POUR UN ESSIEU DE VÉHICULE | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.12.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 09.11.2022 | |
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 09.11.2022 | |
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 09.11.2022 | |
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]ES1051061U (LOSADA ALVAREZ AGUEDA [ES]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0836984 (WEWELER NV [NL]) [AD] 1-3* figure - *; | [A]CN201205856Y (SHANGHAI KOMMAN VEHICLE PARTS [CN]) [A] 1-3 * figures 3-4 *; | [A]EP2915727 (ACCESORIOS Y ELEVADORES VALENCIA S L [ES]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [XI] - Unknown, "Relevages d'essieu pour remorques et semi-remorques", (20130501), pages 1 - 47, URL: https://www.cfj-consulting.fr/app/download/8647146/Catalogue%20Relevages.pdf, (20200225), XP055671505 [X] 1,3 * pages 29-35 * [I] 2 | [A] - Unknown, "MBS-V2 Range Air Suspension for grooved VALX axles VALX Trailer axles", (20180301), pages 1 - 33, URL: https://www.valx.eu/media/423005/tbm_2052-01-valx-mbs-v2.pdf, (20200225), XP055671502 [A] 1-3 * page 20 * | by applicant | EP0836984 |