EP3834937 - CONTAINMENT STRUCTURE WITH ASEPTIC WORKING CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKAN AG Binningerstrasse 116 4123 Allschwil / CH | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann, Frank Martin Hasenrainstrasse 59 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | 02 /
Scholler, Yves 2A rue de Buschwiller F-68220 Hegenheim / FR | 03 /
Sommerhalder, Matthias Rebenstrasse 9 CH-4112 Bättwil / CH | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Ullrich, Gerhard AXON Patent GmbH Austrasse 67 P.O. Box 607 4147 Aesch / CH | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19405020.9 | 10.12.2019 | [2021/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3834937 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L1/04, A61L2/00, B08B15/02 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
B01L1/04 (EP,US);
B01L1/00 (KR);
A61L2/22 (EP,US);
B01D46/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/62 (EP,KR,US);
B08B15/023 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
B01D2273/30 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/087 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBAU EINES CONTAINMENTS MIT EINER ASEPTISCHEN ARBEITSKAMMER | [2021/24] | English: | CONTAINMENT STRUCTURE WITH ASEPTIC WORKING CHAMBER | [2021/24] | French: | STRUCTURE D'UN CONFINEMENT DOTÉE D'UNE CHAMBRE DE TRAVAIL ASEPTIQUE | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 19.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011058986 (YOKOI YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0022] - [ 103] - [0124] - [ 136] - [0142]; figures 1,4 * [I] 6-15; | [A]CH705249 (SKAN AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2974748 (PHARMABIO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016165031 (SKAN AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019012696 (HITACHI INDUSTRY EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2666532 | EP3170545 |