EP3722617 - HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana Italia S.r.L. Localita Linfano Zona Industriale 38062 Arco / IT | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartoli, Maurizio Via Georgi Dimitrov 23 42123 Reggio Emilia / IT | 02 /
Fasano, Stefano Via Ferruccio Garavaglia, 21 42124 Reggio Emilia / IT | 03 /
Moser, Davide Via Enrico Fermi, 23 38123 Trento / IT | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 19425025.4 | 08.04.2019 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3722617 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/02, F15B11/17, F15B21/14 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
F15B1/024 (EP);
F15B11/17 (EP);
F15B21/14 (EP);
F15B2211/20515 (EP);
F15B2211/20523 (EP);
F15B2211/20569 (EP);
F15B2211/20576 (EP);
F15B2211/212 (EP);
F15B2211/6306 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULIKKREISLAUF | [2020/42] | English: | HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT | [2020/42] | French: | CIRCUIT HYDRAULIQUE | [2020/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2007186548 (SMITH DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0022] - [0024] - [0033] - [0034] - [0027]; figure 2; examples 12,26,28,30,32,40,47,120,122 * [A] 6,8,10,12,14; | [XA]EP3159456 (CNH IND ITALIA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,13,15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0024]; figure 2; examples 34,36,52,56,62,66,70,76,78,80,82 * [A] 3,5,11,12,14; | [XA]US10100847 (WU CHUNNAN [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,13-15 * col. 42, line52-54; col. 43,9-10,44-45; controller 30; col. 3, lines 40-44; pressure sensors S1,S2L,S2R,S3L,S3R,S4, col. 3, lines 45-61;; figures 10,18,22; examples 11,14,21,35,44,410L,410H,430,440A,450A,451A,,460 * [A] 5,8,11,12; | [XA]US2003213238 (SMITH DAVID P [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,13,15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0033] , [0034] , [0035]; figure 1; examples 10,12,14,16,63,64,65,85,88,90,92,94,96 * [A] 5,10-12,14; | [XAI]US9745972 (KRITTIAN LUKAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,13-15 * col. 7-8; electronic control 40 with pressure sensor 34 control valves col.10 lines 5-8, 26-27 and 42-43; process of using pump and accumulator to start engine col. 11 lines 16-30;pump/motor starts/drives combustion engine, col.6, lines 55-61 and col.11, line 64-67;; figure 3; examples 1,2,4,6,7,9,20,25,32,34,40,52,55,60 * [A] 5-7,11,12 [I] 10; | [XAY]WO2012125798 (LOWMAN ROGER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,13-15 * proportional valve 46, para. 0018; electronic controllel 40 with sensors 32,34 control engine and circuit, para 0011-00013; pump and accumulator drive/start engine para. 0015-0016;; paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; figure 1; examples 12,14,16,18,22,24,32,34,40,42,44,46 * [A] 5,7,8,10,11 [Y] 12; | [Y]CN108953419 (HANGCHA GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 12 * proporti0nal control valve block 7 connected to pump and hydraulic device and having further ports;; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2015117962 |