EP3712870 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR VALIDATING SPEED LIMIT INFORMATION FOR A ROAD VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenuity AB Konsert Strategy & IP Arvid Wallgrens backe 20 413 46 Göteborg / SE | [2021/41] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states ZENUITY AB Lindholmspiren 3B 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thelen, Sebastian Zenuity GmbH Blumenstrasse 21 85354 FREISING / DE | 02 /
Amza, Diana Zenuity AB Mölndalsvägen 89B, lgh 1201 412 63 GÖTEBORG / SE | 03 /
Alexandersson, Eric Zenuity AB Stigbergstorget 1 414 63 GÖTEBORG / SE | 04 /
Dackenberg, Jens Zenuity AB Ostindiefararen 5 417 65 GÖTTEBORG / SE | 05 /
Lu, Lisa Zenuity AB Oxforan 9 436 54 HOVÅS / SE | 06 /
Berger, Cornelis Zenuity AB c/o Miguel Gillenius Regnvädersgatan 22, lgh 1002 418 32 GÖTEBORG / SE | 07 /
Israelsson, Erik Zenuity AB Norra Gubberogatan 19B 416 63 GÖTEBORG / SE | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [2022/44] |
Former [2020/39] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19446502.7 | 21.03.2019 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712870 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3712870 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01, G06K9/00, G08G1/0962, G01C21/32 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G08G1/0112 (EP);
G08G1/0137 (CN);
G06V20/582 (EP,US);
B60W40/02 (US);
G01C21/30 (US);
G01C21/3602 (US);
G06V20/588 (US);
G08G1/0129 (EP);
G08G1/0133 (EP);
G08G1/052 (CN);
G08G1/09623 (EP);
G08G1/09626 (EP);
G08G1/0967 (CN);
B60W2540/10 (US);
B60W2540/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR VALIDIERUNG VON GESCHWINDIGKEITSBEGRENZUNGSINFORMATIONEN FÜR EIN STRASSENFAHRZEUG | [2020/39] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR VALIDATING SPEED LIMIT INFORMATION FOR A ROAD VEHICLE | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DE VALIDATION D'INFORMATIONS DE SUR LA VITESSE LIMITE POUR VÉHICULE ROUTIER | [2020/39] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 19.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | IT | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | IE | 21.03.2023 | LU | 21.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
IE | 21.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
IE | 21.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
IE | 21.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009041304 (BRADAI BENAZOUZ [FR], et al); | [AD]US2016042239 (FOWE JAMES ADEYEMI [US], et al); | [XY]EP3021302 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2016347312 (TOMATSU NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2017116485 (MULLEN JONATHAN THOMAS [US]); | [Y]US2018023973 (IVANOV VOLODYMYR [DE], et al); | [A]EP3418997 (HERE GLOBAL BV [NL]) | Examination | JP6319187B | US2019005812 | by applicant | US2016042239 |