EP3698844 - BRAIN STIMULATION SYSTEM, DEVICE, ARRANGEMENT AND CORRESPONDING METHOD FOR TREATING APHASIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuro Device Group Spolka Akcyjna Plowiecka 1 04-501 Warszawa / PL | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malej, Krzysztof Mateusz c/o Neuro Device Group S.A. ul. Plowiecka 1 04-501 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
Soluch, Pawel Sebastian c/o Neuro Device Group S.A. ul. Plowiecka 1 04-501 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
Orzechowski, Mateusz Marek c/o Neuro Device Group S.A. ul. Plowiecka 1 04-501 Warszawa / PL | [2020/46] |
Former [2020/35] | 01 /
Malej, Krzysztof Mateusz Neuro Device Group S.A. Zaciszna 4B/7 05-402 Otwock / PL | ||
02 /
Soluch, Pawel Sebastian Neuro Device Group S.A. Rzeczypospolitej 18/93 02-972 Warszawa / PL | |||
03 /
Orzechowski, Mateusz Marek Neuro Device Group S.A. Katiuszy 7/9 04-453 Warszawa / PL | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Christian, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 19461515.9 | 25.02.2019 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698844 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, // A61N1/04, A61B5/00, G09B19/04 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61N1/36025 (EP,US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/4848 (EP);
A61N1/3603 (EP);
A61N1/36034 (EP,US);
G09B19/04 (EP,US);
G16H20/70 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B2505/09 (EP);
A61B5/165 (EP);
A61B5/4064 (EP);
A61B5/4803 (EP);
A61B5/4833 (EP);
A61N1/0456 (EP);
A61N1/36031 (EP);
G09B7/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HIRNSTIMULATIONSSYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG, ANORDNUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON APHASIE | [2020/35] | English: | BRAIN STIMULATION SYSTEM, DEVICE, ARRANGEMENT AND CORRESPONDING METHOD FOR TREATING APHASIA | [2020/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STIMULATION CÉRÉBRALE, DISPOSITIF, AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'APHASIE | [2020/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007138598 (TYLERTON INTERNAT INC [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,12-20 * page 25, line 3 - page 32, line 12 * * page 38, line 20 - page 42, line 16 * * page 50, line 26 - page 59, line 32 * * page 80, line 10 - page 81, line 27 * * figures 1-4, 8-10, 12; claims 15-19 * [I] 11; | [X]CN105664357 (UNIV TIANJIN) [X] 1-3,8,13,17,18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP3106202 (UNIV TAIPEI MEDICAL [TW], et al) [X] 1,17,19 * paragraphs [0037] - [0046]; figures 1, 2, 4 *; | [XI]US2017361096 (WINGEIER BRETT [US]) [X] 1-10,12-20 * paragraphs [0016] - [0056] - [0074] , [0101] , [0135] - [0141]; figures 1, 8 * [I] 11; | [XI] - Pawel Soluch, "Neuro Device", Chivas Venture 2018, (2018), URL: https://www.chivas.com/pl-pl/the-venture/alumni/2018/pl-pawel-soluch, (20190805), XP055610745 [X] 1-6,13,15-20 * the whole document * [I] 7-12,14 | [XI] - Anonymous, "NeuroDevice Voic", Poland, (201806), URL: http://www.neurodevice.pl/wp-content/uploads/2018/06/Voic_brochure-1.pdf, (20190801), XP055610474 [X] 1-6,13,15-20 * the whole document * [I] 7-12,14 | [X] - PRIYANKA P. SHAH-BASAK ET AL, "Individualized treatment with transcranial direct current stimulation in patients with chronic non-fluent aphasia due to stroke", FRONTIERS IN HUMAN NEUROSCIENCE, (20150421), vol. 9, doi:10.3389/fnhum.2015.00201, XP055610703 [X] 17,20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnhum.2015.00201 | by applicant | - R. HOLLAND; J. CRINION, "Can tDCS enhance treatment of aphasia after stroke?", Aphasiology, (20120000), vol. 26, no. 9, pages 1169 - 1191 |