EP3770025 - A PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Autosystemy SP. Z.O.O. Przemyslowa 3 32-050 Skawina / PL | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODZINA, Radoslaw C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32-050 SKAWINA / PL | 02 /
BARUS, Lukasz C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32-050 SKAWINA / PL | 03 /
SZOSTEK, Dawid C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32-050 SKAWINA / PL | 04 /
NAWROCKI, Mateusz C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32-050 SKAWINA / PL | 05 /
WATOR, Tomasz C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32-050 SKAWINA / PL | 06 /
JURKIEWICZ, Damian C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32-050 SKAWINA / PL | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Bialkowski, Adam Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Industrial Property Department ZA L'Agiot 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 LA VERRIERE 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19461561.3 | 23.07.2019 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770025 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/52 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B60R19/52 (EP,CN,US);
F28F19/002 (US);
B60K11/04 (EP);
F28D21/00 (CN);
F28F9/001 (CN);
F28F9/262 (CN);
B60R2019/525 (EP,CN,US);
F28D2021/0082 (EP,CN);
F28D2021/0094 (EP,CN,US);
F28F2265/02 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EINEN WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2021/04] | English: | A PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER | [2021/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION POUR ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 05.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 29.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016177831 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [A] 1-13* pages 3-5; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]FR3060106 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [Y] 1-6,12,13 * pages 6-9; figures 4-5 * [A] 7-11; | [XI]WO2018202631 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * pages 8-13; figures 1-4 * [I] 4-6,9-13; | [YA]FR3066012 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [Y] 1-6,12,13 * pages 8-16; figures 1-4 * [A] 7-11 |