EP3743212 - TUBE TRAY FOR SECONDARY TUBES AND SECONDARY TUBE HANDLING MODULE FOR AN AUTOMATED PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/49] | TUBE TRAY FOR SECONDARY TUBES, SECONDARY TUBE HANDLING MODULE, AND METHOD OF HANDLING SECONDARY TUBES IN AN AUTOMATED PROCESSING SYSTEM | ||
[2023/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHNER, Nicolas c/o Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Wil / CH | 02 /
CAFLISCH, Erich c/o Hamilton Bonaduz AG Via Crusch 8 7402 Bonaduz / CH | 03 /
CHIU, Lawrence c/o Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | 04 /
HAAG, Raphael c/o Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | 05 /
HITT, Reiner c/o Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2023/31] |
Former [2020/49] | 01 /
LEHNER, Nicolas c/o Helbling Technik AG Hubstrasse 24 9500 Wil / CH | ||
02 /
CAFLISCH, Erich c/o Hamilton Bonaduz AG Via Crusch 8 7402 Bonaduz / CH | |||
03 /
CHIU, Lawrence c/o Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | |||
04 /
HAAG, Raphael c/o Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | |||
05 /
HITT, Reiner c/o Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons LLP (Munich), et al Lehel Carré Gewürzmühlstraße 11 80538 Munich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | Teschemacher, Andrea, et al Simmons & Simmons LLP Lehel Carré Thierschplatz 6 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/49] | Teschemacher, Andrea Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19700952.5 | 22.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019EP51513 | Priority number, date | EP20180153040 | 23.01.2018 Original published format: EP 18153040 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145305 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743212 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3743212 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L9/06, G01N35/04, G01N35/10, B65C9/02 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B01L9/06 (EP,US);
B65C9/02 (EP,US);
G01N35/04 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0406 (US);
G01N2035/1032 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | B01L9/06, B65C9/02, G01N35/04, G01N35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRWANNE FÜR SEKUNDÄRROHRE UND SEKUNDÄRROHRHANDHABUNGSMODUL FÜR EIN AUTOMATISIERTES VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/17] | English: | TUBE TRAY FOR SECONDARY TUBES AND SECONDARY TUBE HANDLING MODULE FOR AN AUTOMATED PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2023/17] | French: | PLATEAU DE TUBES POUR TUBES SECONDAIRES ET MODULE DE MANIPULATION DE TUBE SECONDAIRE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT AUTOMATISÉ | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/49] | ROHRWANNE FÜR SEKUNDÄRROHRE, SEKUNDÄRROHRHANDHABUNGSMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG VON SEKUNDÄRROHREN IN EINEM AUTOMATISIERTEN VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/49] | TUBE TRAY FOR SECONDARY TUBES, SECONDARY TUBE HANDLING MODULE, AND METHOD OF HANDLING SECONDARY TUBES IN AN AUTOMATED PROCESSING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/49] | PLATEAU DE TUBE POUR TUBES SECONDAIRES, MODULE DE MANIPULATION DE TUBE SECONDAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION DE TUBES SECONDAIRES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT AUTOMATISÉ | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 27.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23166557.1 / EP4219014 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | LU | 22.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SI | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SI | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9907627 (EXPER S A S DI PERONI GUENTHER [IT], et al) [A] 11-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008116219 (LAWRENCE MICHAEL PAUL [US]) [A] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP3136109 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10 * paragraph [0177] - paragraph [0179]; figures 11,12 * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0195]; figures 16a-18b * [I] 9; | [A]DE102016207917 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2* the whole document * | by applicant | EP181530403 | US9598197 |