EP3737511 - CLEANING SYSTEM WITH A DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A MIXTURE COMPRISING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE AND ACTIVATION AREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/47] | SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING A MIXTURE COMPRISING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE AND ACTIVATION AREAS | ||
[2023/52] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gmeilbauer, Engelbert Stocketweg 1 82229 Seefeld / DE | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB ALPHA-Haus Garmischer Strasse 35 81373 München / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19701434.3 | 11.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019DE100023 | Priority number, date | DE201810100648 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018100648 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137582 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737511 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737511 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02, B08B5/02, B08B1/00, F16K31/60 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B08B3/028 (EP);
B08B1/10 (EP);
B08B1/12 (EP);
B08B1/14 (EP);
B08B1/40 (EP);
B08B5/02 (EP);
F16K31/60 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | B08B3/02, B08B5/02, B08B1/00, F16K11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUSBRINGEN EINES GEMISCHES MIT JUSTIEREINRICHTUNG UND AKTIVIERUNGSBEREICHEN | [2023/52] | English: | CLEANING SYSTEM WITH A DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A MIXTURE COMPRISING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE AND ACTIVATION AREAS | [2023/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NETTOYAGE AVEC UN DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER UN MÉLANGE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE ET DES ZONES D'ACTIVATION | [2023/52] |
Former [2020/47] | SYSTEM ZUM AUSBRINGEN EINES GEMISCHES MIT JUSTIEREINRICHTUNG UND AKTIVIERUNGSBEREICHEN | ||
Former [2020/47] | SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING A MIXTURE COMPRISING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE AND ACTIVATION AREAS | ||
Former [2020/47] | SYSTÈME POUR APPLIQUER UN MÉLANGE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE ET DES ZONES D'ACTIVATION | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 11.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |