EP3746372 - COVERING DEVICE FOR A DRINKING VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARTNER investments GMBH Dampfschiffstraße 14/22 1030 Wien / AT | [2021/50] |
Former [2020/50] | For all designated states Stöckl, Amédé Brunner Strasse 75 Objekt C, 2. OG, Top 203 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖCKL, Amédé Brunner Straße 75 Objekt C, 2. OG, Top 203 1230 Wien / AT | [2021/50] |
Former [2020/50] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/50] | Puchberger & Partner Patentanwälte Reichsratsstraße 13 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 19701655.3 | 25.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019EP51833 | Priority number, date | AT20180000500U | 30.01.2018 Original published format: AT 5001818 U | [2020/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149627 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746372 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3746372 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D45/02 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
A47B88/46 (EP);
B65D51/04 (AT,US);
B65D45/025 (EP,US);
B65D45/02 (EP);
B65D51/14 (AT);
B65D51/145 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN TRINKGEFÄSS | [2020/50] | English: | COVERING DEVICE FOR A DRINKING VESSEL | [2020/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECOUVREMENT D'UN RÉCIPIENT POUR BOISSON | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 06.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Observations by third parties | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2024
07.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Beerwilly GmbH Kärntnerstr. 115 8700 Leoben / AT Opponent's representative Echterhoff, Benjamin Alexander Echterhoff IP Richard-Wagner-Straße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2024
07.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Beerwilly GmbH Kärntnerstr. 115 8700 Leoben / AT Opponent's representative Echterhoff, Benjamin Alexander Echterhoff IP Platzl 5 80331 München / DE | 22.03.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 25.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE51373 ; | [A]FR429014 (FRIEDRICH EMIL KROENERT [DE]); | [A]GB191124910 (SCHWANDT JOHANN HERMANN [DE]) | Examination | US481644 | US5901885 | CN202729760U | other | GB24910 | DE51373 | US481644 | FR429014 | US2073043 | CN202729760U | Opposition | DE51373 | FR429014 | GB191324910 | US1733807 | US5901885 | CN202729760U |