EP3746419 - METHODS OF PURIFYING CANNABINOIDS USING LIQUID:LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phytoplant Research S.L. Rabanales 21 The Science and Technology Park of Córdoba Calle Astrónoma Cecilia Payne. Edificio Centauro módulo B-1 14014 Córdoba / ES | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADAL ROURA, Xavier Phytoplant Research S.L. Rabanales 21 - The Science and Technology Park of Córdoba Calle Astrónoma Cecilia Payne Edificio Centauro Módulo B-1 14014 Córdoba / ES | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19702843.4 | 29.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019EP52069 | Priority number, date | US201815882516 | 29.01.2018 Original published format: US201815882516 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145552 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746419 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/72, C07C37/00, C07C39/23, C07C39/19, C07C51/48, C07C65/19, C07D311/80, B01D11/02, B01D11/04, B01D15/18 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
C07C37/004 (EP,IL);
B01D11/0203 (EP,IL);
B01D11/0288 (EP,IL);
B01D11/0492 (EP,IL);
B01D15/1892 (EP,IL);
B01D9/0004 (EP,IL);
C07C39/19 (IL);
C07C39/23 (IL);
C07C51/48 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
C07C37/004, C07C39/19 (EP);
C07C37/004, C07C39/23 (EP);
C07C51/48, C07C65/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON CANNABINOIDEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FLÜSSIG-FLÜSSIGCHROMATOGRAFIE | [2020/50] | English: | METHODS OF PURIFYING CANNABINOIDS USING LIQUID:LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PURIFICATION DE CANNABINOÏDES PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE LIQUIDE : LIQUIDE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 28.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2016135346 (BIONORICA ETHICS GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-27* example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2016187679 (POBELCH - GLE OOD [BG]) [Y] 1-27 * example - *; | [XYI]US2018000879 (NADAL ROURA XAVIER [ES]) [X] 1,6,10-13,19-21,26 * examples 1,10 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0062] * [Y] 1-27 [I] 2-5,7-9,14-18,22-25,27 | by applicant | WO9111172 | WO9402518 | WO9855148 | WO0035298 | US6106864 | WO2016135346 | US9765000 | US10155708 | - HAZEKAMP et al., "Preparative Isolation of Cannabinoids from Cannabis sativa by Centrifugal Partition Chromatography", Journal of Liquid Chromatography & Related Technologies, (20040111), vol. 27, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1081/JLC-200028170, pages 2421 - 2439, XP055202081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/JLC-200028170 | - MEIJER EP; HAMMOND KM, "The inheritance of chemical phenotype in Cannabis sativa L. (II): Cannabigerol predominant plants", Euphytica, (20050000), vol. 145, doi:doi:10.1007/s10681-005-1164-8, pages 189 - 198, XP019240971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10681-005-1164-8 | - DE MEIJER EP; BAGATTA M; CARBONI A; CRUCITTI P; MOLITERNI VM; RANALLI P; MANDOLINO G, "The inheritance of chemical phenotype in Cannabis sativa L", Genetics, (20030100), vol. 163, no. 1, pages 335 - 46, XP002542793 | - LIANG; CHEN, Expert Opinion in Therapeutic patents, (20010000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 981 - 986 | - H. LIEBERMAN; L. LACHMAN, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, Marcel Dekker, (19800000), vol. 1 | - VERMA et al., Pharmaceutical Technology On-line, (20010000), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 1 - 14 | - FINNIN; MORGAN, J Pharm Sci, (19991000), vol. 88, no. 10, pages 955 - 958 | US19440621066 |