EP3752512 - METAL COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UDC Ireland Limited Blanchardstown Corporate Park 2 Ballycoolin, Dublin 15 / IE | [2023/42] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOESSEL, Philipp Guenthersburgallee 93 60389 FRANKFURT AM MAIN / DE | 02 /
AUCH, Armin c/o Merck KGaA Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/52] | 01 /
STOESSEL, Philipp Guenthersburgallee 93 60389 FRANKFURT AM MAIN / DE | ||
02 /
AUCH, Armin Im Busch 12 64297 DARMSTADT / DE | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19702926.7 | 11.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019EP53231 | Priority number, date | EP20180156388 | 13.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18156388 | [2020/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019158453 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3752512 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3752512 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C09K11/06, H01L51/00, H01L51/50 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
C07F15/0033 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR);
H10K85/342 (EP,KR);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,KR);
C09K2211/1059 (EP,KR);
C09K2211/1088 (EP,KR);
C09K2211/1092 (EP,KR);
C09K2211/185 (EP,KR);
H10K2101/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | C07F15/00, C09K11/06, H01L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLKOMPLEXE | [2020/52] | English: | METAL COMPLEXES | [2020/52] | French: | COMPLEXES MÉTALLIQUES | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 14.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [IY]WO2017032439 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2018026208 (TSAI JUI-YI [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2018019688 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [XP]WO2018178001 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US5061569 | WO9509147 | EP0652273 | WO0149806 | EP1205527 | WO02051850 | WO02060910 | US2003006411 | EP1336208 | WO2004013080 | WO2004085449 | JP2004288381 | WO2004093207 | WO2005011013 | US2005069729 | WO2005039246 | WO2005111172 | JP2005347160 | EP1617710 | EP1617711 | WO2006005627 | JP2006135145 | EP1661888 | WO2006100896 | WO2006117052 | WO2006122630 | EP1731584 | US2006289882 | WO2007063754 | WO2007137725 | WO2007140847 | WO2008006449 | US7332232 | WO2008056746 | WO2008086851 | WO2009062578 | US2009134784 | US2009136779 | WO2009148015 | WO2010006680 | WO2010015306 | WO2010050778 | WO2010054729 | WO2010054730 | WO2010108579 | WO2010136109 | WO2011000455 | WO2011042107 | WO2011088877 | JP4747558B | WO2012008550 | WO2012034627 | WO2012048778 | WO2012095143 | WO2012150001 | WO2014056565 | WO2014094964 | EP2780325 | WO2015018539 | WO2015049030 | EP2875092 | EP2875699 | EP2875004 | WO2015169412 | WO2016124304 | WO2016184540 |