EP3749645 - 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHEXYLAMINO)-N-(2-(PIPERAZIN-1-YL)ETHYL)BENZENESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED FERROSTATIN-1 ANALOGUES AS CELL DEATH INHIBITORS FOR TREATING E.G. STROKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/51] | 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHEXYLAMINO)-N-(2-(PIPERAZIN-1-YL)ETHYL)BENZENESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED FERROSTATIN-1 ANALOGUES AS CELL DEATH INHIBITORS FOR TREATING E.G. STROKE | ||
[2024/04] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | 24.07.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIB VZW Suzanne Tassierstraat 1 9052 Gent / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Antwerpen Prinsstraat 12 2000 Antwerpen / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states VIB VZW Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Antwerpen Prinsstraat 12 2000 Antwerpen / BE | |||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | |||
Former [2020/51] | For all designated states VIB vzw Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Antwerpen Prinsstraat 12 2000 Antwerpen / BE | |||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDENABEELE, Peter Nijverheidstraat 18 9040 Sint-Amandsberg / BE | 02 /
VANDEN BERGHE, Tom Stuurstraat 124 9120 Haasdonk / BE | 03 /
AUGUSTYNS, Koen Heike 2 2322 Hoogstraten / BE | 04 /
HOFMANS, Sam Dirkputstraat 81 Bus 2.2 2850 Boom / BE | 05 /
VAN DER VEKEN, Pieter Goorboslei 47 2560 Sint-Katelijne-Waver / BE | 06 /
DEVISSCHER, Lars Dokter Paul Janssenlaan 5, bus 3 2300 Turnhout / BE | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19703097.6 | 05.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019EP52751 | Priority number, date | GB20180001943 | 07.02.2018 Original published format: GB 201801943 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154795 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749645 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/38, C07D295/14, C07D295/12, C07D213/38, A61K31/18, A61K31/495, A61K31/5375, A61P9/10, A61P3/10, A61P37/06, A61P25/28, A61P25/16, // A61K31/185, A61P1/16, A61P25/14, C07C311/17, C07C311/39, C07C311/40, C07C311/41 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C07D295/14 (EP);
C07C311/39 (EP,US);
A61K31/185 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C311/38 (EP);
C07C311/40 (EP);
C07C311/41 (EP);
C07D213/38 (EP);
C07D221/00 (US);
C07D227/02 (US);
C07D227/04 (US);
C07D241/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | C07C311/38, C07D295/14, C07D295/12, C07D213/38, A61K31/18, A61K31/495, A61K31/5375, A61P9/10, A61P3/10, A61P37/06, A61P25/28, A61P25/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHEXYLAMINO)-N-(2-(PIPERAZIN-1-YL)ETHYL)BENZENSULFONAMID-DERIVATE UND ÄHNLICHE FERROSTATIN-1 ANALOGE ALS ZELLTOD-INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON Z.B. SCHLAGANFALL | [2024/32] | English: | 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHEXYLAMINO)-N-(2-(PIPERAZIN-1-YL)ETHYL)BENZENESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED FERROSTATIN-1 ANALOGUES AS CELL DEATH INHIBITORS FOR TREATING E.G. STROKE | [2024/32] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHÉXYLAMINO)-N-(2-(PIPÉRAZIN-1-YL)ÉTHYL)BENZENESULFONAMIDE ET ANALOGUES DE FERROSTATIN-1 SIMILAIRES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA MORT CELLULAIRE POUR LE TRAITEMENT PAR EX. D'UN ACCIDENT VASCULAIRE CÉRÉBRAL | [2024/32] |
Former [2020/51] | 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHEXYLAMINO)-N-(2-PIPERAZIN-1-YL) ETHYL) BENZOLSULFONAMIDDERIVATE UND VERWANDTE FERROSTATIN-1-ANALOGA ALS ZELLTODINHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON Z.B. SCHLAGANFALL | ||
Former [2020/51] | 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHEXYLAMINO)-N-(2-(PIPERAZIN-1-YL)ETHYL)BENZENESULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED FERROSTATIN-1 ANALOGUES AS CELL DEATH INHIBITORS FOR TREATING E.G. STROKE | ||
Former [2020/51] | DÉRIVÉS DE 3-(BENZYLAMINO)-4-(CYCLOHEXYLAMINO)-N-(2-(PIPÉRAZIN-1-YL)ÉTHYL)BENZÈNESULFONAMIDE ET ANALOGUES DE FERROSTATINE-1 ASSOCIÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE MORT CELLULAIRE POUR LE TRAITEMENT, PAR EXEMPLE, D'UN ACCIDENT VASCULAIRE CÉRÉBRAL | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 07.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2016075330 (VIB VZW [BE], et al); |