EP3700025 - SEALED ELECTRIC PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLEX CABLE ASSEMBLY (SHENZHEN) CO., LTD. 1173, Shenhui Road, Bao 'an Village, Henggang Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518115 / CN | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, ChangChun 13-A701 Bihu Rose Garden Longgan Central City Shenzhen Guangdong 518115 / CN | 02 /
TOH, Mui Lian Jessica 33 Hindhede Walk 04-09 Singapore 587968 / SG | 03 /
MO, Yuanwen Block 454 Clementi Ave 3 22-556 Singapore 120454 / SG | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19703233.7 | 01.02.2019 | [2020/35] | WO2019CN74382 | Priority number, date | CN201811571707 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811571707 | [2020/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020124755 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700025 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/28, H02G1/14, H01R13/504, H01R13/52, H01R13/58, H01R13/66, G01K1/14, H01R13/405, H01R43/24, // H01R13/50, H01R24/30 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H01R13/6683 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G01K1/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01R13/5202 (CN,IL,KR);
H01R24/20 (CN,IL,KR);
G01K7/24 (IL,US);
H01R13/405 (EP,IL,KR);
H01R13/46 (CN,IL);
H01R13/501 (EP,IL,KR);
H01R13/504 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H01R13/5205 (IL,US);
H01R13/5208 (EP,IL,KR);
H01R13/521 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
H01R13/5219 (CN,IL);
H01R13/5221 (CN,IL,KR);
H01R13/5845 (EP,IL,KR);
H01R13/713 (CN,IL);
H01R13/7137 (CN,IL,KR);
H01R24/30 (EP,IL,KR);
H01R43/24 (EP,IL,KR);
H02G1/14 (EP,IL,KR);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | H01R24/28, H02G1/14, H01R13/504, H01R13/52, H01R13/58, H01R13/66, G01K1/00, G01D11/24, H01R13/405, H01R43/24, // H01R13/50, H01R24/30 | ||
Former IPC [2020/35] | H01R24/28, H02G1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | ABGEDICHTETER ELEKTRISCHER STECKER | [2020/35] | English: | SEALED ELECTRIC PLUG | [2020/35] | French: | FICHE ÉLECTRIQUE ÉTANCHE | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2019 | Translation filed | 18.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2019 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 15.07.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 21.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 03.03.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 30.12.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2023 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.09.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 13.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2172836 (ITT PRODUITS IND [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, line 26 - line 35; figure 4 *; | [Y]DE8633492U (HUO-LI LI) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2004018780 (MOTT ALLEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0032]; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE102007042589 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2016081909 (VOLEX PLC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0035] , [0025] , [0026] , [0037] , [0038] , [0040] , [0032] , [0038] , [0018] , [0039]; figures 5A,4A,2,3,6A-6D *; | [Y]US2018366870 (MIYAZAWA YUUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 9* paragraphs [0032] , [0038]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]EP1498991 (SCHALTBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8, 18, 23; | [A]CN202712571U (ZHANG JINCHAO) [A] 1-29; | [A]CN203277803U (YUYAO CITY JIARONG ELECTRONIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) [A] 1-29 * 0012-0021, 1-3 *; | [A]CN203326256U (CHANGSHU LIDE ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES CO LTD) [A] 1-29; | [Y]CN205657246U (CHANGSHU CITY LIDE ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-29 * " *; | [Y]CN107112698 (VOLEX PLC) [Y] 1-29; | [A]CN108023224 (UNIV SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CHINA)[A] 1-29; | [A]CN207732169U (ZHEJIANG ZHONGHANG ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1-29 |