EP3747019 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMAL SENSOR PLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMADANI, Ali, Akbar, Ahmad High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PARVANEH, Saman High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 19703258.4 | 28.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019EP51934 | Priority number, date | US201862625932P | 02.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862625932 P | US201862750375P | 25.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750375 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149640 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747019 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/67, A61B5/00, H04W4/02, H04W24/02 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
G16H40/67 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/1123 (EP);
A61B5/7264 (EP);
G06F17/18 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W4/38 (EP);
A61B2560/0223 (EP);
A61B5/0002 (EP);
A61B5/02416 (EP);
A61B5/1116 (EP);
A61B5/318 (EP);
A61B5/6887 (EP);
A61B5/7267 (EP);
H04W88/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMALEN SENSORPLATZIERUNG | [2020/50] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMAL SENSOR PLACEMENT | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSE OPTIMALE DE CAPTEURS | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US9551594 (STAMATAKIS JULIEN G [US]) [A] 1-19 * figures 2,3,7 * * column 1, line 10 - line 20 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 10 ** column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 62 *; | [IY] - YONGMIAN ZHANG ET AL, "Active and dynamic information fusion for multisensor systems with dynamic bayesian networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS. PART B:CYBERNETICS., US, (20060313), vol. 36, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TSMCB.2005.859081, ISSN 1083-4419, pages 467 - 472, XP055580651 [I] 1-8,12-19 * the whole document * [Y] 9-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSMCB.2005.859081 | [Y] - MASAMICHI SHIMOSAKA ET AL, "ZigBee based wireless indoor localization with sensor placement optimization towards practical home sensing*", ADVANCED ROBOTICS, NL, (20160222), vol. 30, no. 5, doi:10.1080/01691864.2015.1132636, ISSN 0169-1864, pages 315 - 325, XP055581019 [Y] 9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01691864.2015.1132636 | [A] - DILIN WANG ET AL, "Efficient Observation Selection in Probabilistic Graphical Models Using Bayesian Lower Bounds", UNCERTAINTY IN ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE 2016, (20160629), XP055581648 [A] 1-19 * the whole document, especially sections "1 Introduction", "2 Background", "3 Bayesian CR bound for label selection", * | [A] - VIKRAM KRISHNAMURTHY, "Algorithms for Optimal Scheduling and Management of Hidden Markov Model Sensors", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020807), vol. 50, no. 6, ISSN 1053-587X, XP011080150 [A] 1-19 * the whole document, especially sections "I. introduction" and "II. Signal Model and Problem Formulation" on pages 1382-1386 * |