EP3724413 - FOOD WASTE DISPOSER THROAT BAFFLE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/43] | FOOD WASTE DISPOSER THROAT BAFFLE APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
[2023/11] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8000 West Florissant Ave. St. Louis, MO 63136 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Thomas, R. 29984 N Suscito Drive Peoria, AZ 85383 / US | 02 /
RETZKE, Brian 10S472 Dunham Dr. Downers Grove, IL 60516 / US | 03 /
NIKOLIC, Mile 3121 Midlane Drive Wadsworth, IL 60083 / US | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/43] | 01 /
BERGER, Thomas, R. 5734 Mt. Vernon Way Racine, WI 53406 / US | ||
02 /
RETZKE, Brian 10S472 Dunham Dr. Downers Grove, IL 60516 / US | |||
03 /
NIKOLIC, Mile 3121 Midlane Drive Wadsworth, IL 60083 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/43] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19704167.6 | 23.01.2019 | [2020/43] | WO2019US14806 | Priority number, date | US201862622539P | 26.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862622539 P | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019147712 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724413 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3724413 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/266 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
E03C1/2665 (EP,US);
B02C18/0092 (US);
B02C18/12 (US);
B29C39/10 (US);
B02C2201/06 (US);
B29K2101/12 (US);
E03C1/262 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANSCHETTE FÜR LEBENSMITTELABFALLZERKLEINERER | [2023/11] | English: | FOOD WASTE DISPOSER THROAT BAFFLE APPARATUS | [2023/11] | French: | APPAREIL POUR GORGE DE BROYEUR DE DÉCHETS ALIMENTAIRES | [2023/11] |
Former [2020/43] | VORRICHTUNG FÜR PRALLSTRAHLABLENKVORRICHTUNG FÜR LEBENSMITTELABFÄLLE UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2020/43] | FOOD WASTE DISPOSER THROAT BAFFLE APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
Former [2020/43] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉFLECTEUR DE GORGE DE BROYEUR DE DÉCHETS ALIMENTAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 17.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE959244 (GIVEN MACHINERY COMPANY) [X] 1-6,17,18,20 * the whole document * [A] 10-16 [I] 7-9,19; | [XI]US2785864 (HANS JORDAN) [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * [I] 9; | [XI]US2940677 (HANS JORDAN) [X] 1-4,17 * the whole document *[I] 9,19; | [XI]US6735791 (LORDAHL VAR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,17 * the whole document * [I] 9,19 | by applicant | US7264188 |