EP3756204 - HIGH VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH CLOSING RESISTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/01] | HIGH-VOLTAGE POWER SWITCH WITH CLOSING RESISTOR ARRANGEMENT | ||
[2022/35] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERNAT, Radu-Marian Thrasoltstraße 22 10585 Berlin / DE | 02 /
GRUND, Armin Schwiegersteig 21 13629 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KERN, Johannes Weißenstadter Ring 37e 13581 Berlin / DE | 04 /
LÖBNER, Friedrich Fischzug 19K 10245 Berlin / DE | 05 /
NOWAKOWSKI, Andrzej Septimerstrasse 18 13407 Berlin / DE | 06 /
REICHERT, Frank Georgenberg 19c 06667 Weißenfels / DE | 07 /
SCHIMMELPFENNIG, Jens Borkener Weg 15 13507 Berlin / DE | 08 /
SINGER, Andre Hauptstr. 114a 16348 Wandlitz OT Schönwalde / DE | 09 /
SÖRRIES, Wolfgang Württembergallee 26/27 14052 Berlin / DE | 10 /
WILKE, Stefan Rudolf-Virchow-Strasse 49 14624 Dallgow-Döberitz / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19704234.4 | 30.01.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019EP52227 | Priority number, date | DE201810205910 | 18.04.2018 Original published format: DE102018205910 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019201486 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756204 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3756204 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/16, H01H9/42, H01H33/662 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H01H33/16 (EP);
H01H33/166 (US);
H01H33/168 (EP);
H01H33/666 (US);
H01H9/42 (EP,US);
H01H33/66207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHSPANNUNGSLEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINSCHALTWIDERSTANDSANORDNUNG | [2021/01] | English: | HIGH VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH CLOSING RESISTOR ASSEMBLY | [2022/35] | French: | DISJONCTEUR HAUTE TENSION AVEC AGENCEMENT DE RÉSISTANCE DE FERMETURE | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/01] | HIGH-VOLTAGE POWER SWITCH WITH CLOSING RESISTOR ARRANGEMENT | ||
Former [2021/01] | DISJONCTEUR À HAUTE TENSION À AGENCEMENT DE RÉSISTANCE D'ATTAQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 22.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4009458 (KISHI TUNEO, et al); | [XY]EP0022535 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [YA]EP2034500 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]); | [YA]US2014076853 (CUPPETT MATTHEW [US], et al) | by applicant | US5245145 |