EP3749233 - NEGATIVE PRESSURE-BASED GRIPPING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEPTULUS AB Karl XII-gatan 12 222 20 LUND / SE | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJURSTEN, Henrik Karl XII-gatan 12 222 20 Lund / SE | 02 /
KOVAC, Tim Västra Krattvägen 231 72 Anderslöv / SE | 03 /
GÖTBERG, Matthias Per Henrik Lings Väg 8 224 65 Lund / SE | 04 /
DENCKER, Magnus Trulsibrunnsvägen 14C 236 38 Hölviken / SE | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19704288.0 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019EP52893 | Priority number, date | EP20180155266 | 06.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18155266 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154847 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749233 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/3478 (EP);
A61B17/30 (US);
A61B17/0401 (EP);
A61B17/0469 (US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61M60/113 (EP);
A61B2017/00243 (EP);
A61B2017/00247 (EP);
A61B2017/00292 (US);
A61B2017/00783 (EP);
A61B2017/0243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0441 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0649 (US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (US);
A61B2217/007 (EP);
A61M2005/1585 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | UNTERDRUCKBASIERTES GREIFSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2020/51] | English: | NEGATIVE PRESSURE-BASED GRIPPING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉHENSION À BASE DE PRESSION NÉGATIVE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5443446 (SHTURMAN LEONID [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** column 9, line 26 - column 10, line 20; figures 1-35 *; | [XI]CN1198664 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-20; | [A]US2007038293 (ST GOAR FREDERICK G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0036] - [0143] , [0170] - [0179] - [0191] , [0237]; figures 7-92 *; | [A]US2010004506 (SAADAT VAHID [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0112] - [0123] - [0178]; figures 1-50 *; | [XI]US2010185044 (KASSAB GHASSAN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0123] - [0177] - [0197] - [0231]; figures 1-32 * [I] 3-9,14-20; | [A]WO2012040865 (WEBER ALBERTO [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 11, line 16 - page 15, line 6 * * page 25, line 1 - line 17; figures 1-23 * |