EP3895460 - CONTROLLING REMOTE DEVICES USING USER INTERFACE TEMPLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOJIC, Miroslav 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
DHING, Rohan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Zhengnan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
DELGAUDIO, Michael 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 05 /
HOLLAND, Henry 1-13 St Giles High St London WC2H 8AG / GB | 06 /
JÖNSSON, Mårten 1-13 St Giles High St London WC2H 8AG / GB | 07 /
XU, Ding 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 08 /
NEWTON-DUNN, Henry Owen 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 09 /
KOSER, Mikkel Crone Skt. Petri Passage 5 1165 Copenhagen / DK | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Thorniley, Peter, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19704696.4 | 21.01.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019US14403 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020153933 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895460 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3895460 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/80, H04W4/02, H04L12/28, G08C17/02, H04M1/72415, H04L67/131, G06F9/451 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP);
H04L12/2809 (EP);
H04L67/131 (EP);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04M1/72415 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP);
G08C2201/21 (EP);
G08C2201/30 (US);
G08C2201/42 (US);
G08C2201/91 (EP);
G08C2201/93 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | H04W4/80, H04W4/02, H04L29/06, H04L12/28, G08C17/02, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG VON ENTFERNTEN GERÄTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENSCHABLONEN | [2021/42] | English: | CONTROLLING REMOTE DEVICES USING USER INTERFACE TEMPLATES | [2021/42] | French: | COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIFS DISTANTS À L'AIDE DE MODÈLES D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 16.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015077231 (KANG ZHI [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0079] - [0088] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0121] * * paragraph [0165] * * paragraphs [0179] - [0184] *; | [A]EP2890059 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0086] * * paragraphs [0105] - [0108] *; | [A]US2015268903 (BABA TATSURU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0069] - [0082]; figures 12A, 12B * * paragraphs [0087] - [0093] *; | [A]WO2017135599 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2017372600 (PALIN ARTO [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0101] - [0145] * * paragraphs [0259] - [0286] * * paragraphs [0322] - [0373]; figures 11A-11G * * paragraphs [0406] - [0411] * * paragraphs [0427] - [0458]; figures 13A-13G *; | [A]WO2018017660 (PCMS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0059] *; | [A]US10032365 (XU REX [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 4 * * column 6, line 1 - column 8, line 30 ** column 12, line 7 - column 14, line 15 *; | US2019045043 [ ] (KIM JIN-YOUNG [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0055] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0111] - [0145] * * paragraphs [0153] - [0175] * |