EP3746382 - SAMPLE SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/50] | SAMPLE SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHODS OF SUPPLYING SAMPLES | ||
[2023/46] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings 358 South Main Street Burlington, North Carolina 27215 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, David 1000 Day Hill Road Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US | 02 /
KRAJEWSKI, Jay 1000 Day Hill Road Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US | 03 /
MEYER, Kevin 1000 Day Hill Road Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19705672.4 | 31.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019US16062 | Priority number, date | US201862624359P | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862624359 P | US201862624450P | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862624450 P | US201862624486P | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862624486 P | US201862624419P | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862624419 P | US201862624530P | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862624530 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019152655 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746382 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3746382 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/14, G01N35/04 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
G01N35/04 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (US);
B01L9/06 (US);
G01N35/00732 (US);
B01L2300/021 (US);
B01L2300/0609 (US);
B01L2300/0861 (US);
B01L2300/0864 (US);
G01N2035/00752 (US);
G01N2035/0096 (US);
G01N2035/0406 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0465 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENZUFUHRSYSTEM | [2023/46] | English: | SAMPLE SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2023/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/50] | PROBENZUFUHRSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROBENZUFUHR | ||
Former [2020/50] | SAMPLE SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHODS OF SUPPLYING SAMPLES | ||
Former [2020/50] | SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'ÉCHANTILLONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FOURNITURE D'ÉCHANTILLONS | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 13.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4301131 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6-8 * column 2, line 30 - line 63; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2011209045 (SYSMEX CORP) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0062]; figures 4-8 *; | [XAYI]US2014318927 (PEDRAZZINI GIANANDREA [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11,13,15,17,19,20 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-4 * [A] 18 [Y] 6,9 [I] 3,12,14,16; | [XAYI]US2016229642 (MULET VALLES TOMAS [ES]) [X] 1,4,5,18-20 * paragraphs [0047] , [0051] , [0054] , [0057] , [0062] , [0066] , [0070]; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 6,9-17 [Y] 7,8 [I] 2,3; | [Y]US2017152109 (MIZUKI NAKAMURA [JP]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0075]; figures 2,3 * |