EP3763177 - ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE ARRANGEMENT HAVING AN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE WHICH CAN BE FASTENED TO A SUPPORT ELEMENT, IN PARTICULAR A WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖRNER, Martin Dieselweg 19 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 02 /
NIKOLA, Joachim Dreikönigstraße 7 76703 Kraichtal / DE | 03 /
KOLLAR, Hans, Jürgen Kantstrasse 32 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19705928.0 | 15.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019EP25044 | Priority number, date | DE20181001687 | 05.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018001687 | [2021/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019170290 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763177 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3763177 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05K5/02 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H05K7/20918 (EP);
H05K7/2089 (US);
H05K5/0204 (EP);
H05K7/02 (US);
H05K7/2039 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROGERÄTEANORDNUNG, AUFWEISEND EIN AN EINEM TRAGELEMENT, INSBESONDERE EINER WAND, BEFESTIGBARES ELEKTROGERÄT | [2022/51] | English: | ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE ARRANGEMENT HAVING AN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE WHICH CAN BE FASTENED TO A SUPPORT ELEMENT, IN PARTICULAR A WALL | [2021/02] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE PRÉSENTANT UN APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE POUVANT ÊTRE FIXÉ À UN ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT, EN PARTICULIER UNE PAROI | [2021/02] |
Former [2021/02] | ELEKTROGERÄTEANORDNUNG, AUFWEISEND EINE AN EINEM TRAGELEMENT, INSBESONDERE WAND, BEFESTIGBARES ELEKTROGERÄT | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 05.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2002064028 (NIELSEN JESPER SOEBYGAARD [DK], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0027] - [0035]; figures 1-4 * [A] 9-15; | [A]US2008130232 (YAMAMOTO TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006]; figures 5-8 *; | [A]US2010202109 (ZHENG LI [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0003] - [0007]; figure 1 *; | [YA]DE102015200375 (SCHMIDHAUSER AG [CH]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 9-15 |