EP3775377 - AN ANCHORING ASSEMBLY FOR FASTENING A RAILWAY RAIL TO AN UNDERLYING FOUNDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pandrol Limited Bonemill Lane Gateford Road Worksop, Nottinghamshire S81 7AX / GB | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Pandrol Limited 63 Station Road Addlestone, Surrey KT15 2AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANDEL, Bruno M.B. 400 rue Jean Baptiste Lebas 59552 Lambres Lez Douai / FR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/07] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19707063.4 | 12.02.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019GB50373 | Priority number, date | GB20180005187 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201805187 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019186097 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3775377 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3775377 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3775377 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/38, E01B9/18 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
E01B9/38 (EP);
E01B9/02 (GB,US);
E01B9/483 (US);
E01B9/68 (US);
E01B2201/04 (US);
E01B2205/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERANKERUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER EISENBAHNSCHIENE AN EINEM DARUNTER LIEGENDEN FUNDAMENT | [2021/07] | English: | AN ANCHORING ASSEMBLY FOR FASTENING A RAILWAY RAIL TO AN UNDERLYING FOUNDATION | [2021/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ANCRAGE DESTINÉ À FIXER UN RAIL DE CHEMIN DE FER À UNE FONDATION SOUS-JACENTE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 22.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 08.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3784097 (LANDIS R) [X] 1-7,9-11,15-19 * column 2, lines 50-68 - column 3, lines 60-68; figures 2,3,6 *; | [X]EP0794289 (KRUPP AG HOESCH KRUPP [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,15-19 * column 3, lines 26-44; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1041200 (BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-8,15-19* figures 1-5 *; | [XA]WO2016071379 (VOSSLOH WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,15-19 * page 18; figures 1,2 * [A] 14; | [XA]CN107227660 (LUOYANG SUNRUI RUBBER & PLASTIC TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-12,15-19 * figures 1-14 * [A] 13 |