EP3747153 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUSES FOR IMPLEMENTING SUPER COMMUNITY AND COMMUNITY SIDECHAINS WITH CONSENT MANAGEMENT FOR DISTRIBUTED LEDGER TECHNOLOGIES IN A CLOUD BASED COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salesforce.com, Inc. The Landmark One Market Street Suite 300 San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PADMANABHAN, Prithvi, Krishnan 9616 Davona Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
GOPALAN, Sriram 801 Foster City Blvd. Apt 112 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
MADDALI, Venkata, Sarath c/o Salesforce.com, Inc Salesforce Tower 415 Mission Street 3rd Floor San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | 04 /
DHAMIJA, Darpan 2263 Anna Dr. Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | 05 /
RAJ, Jyoti c/o Salesforce.com, Inc Salesforce Tower 415 Mission Street 3rd Floor San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19707168.1 | 31.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019US16199 | Priority number, date | US201815932100 | 31.01.2018 Original published format: US201815932100 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019152750 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747153 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (US);
G06F21/6245 (US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L63/101 (US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG VON SUPERGEMEINSCHAFTS- UND GEMEINSCHAFTSSEITENKETTEN MIT ZUSTIMMUNGSVERWALTUNG FÜR VERTEILTE KONTENTECHNOLOGIEN IN EINER CLOUD-BASIERTEN RECHNERUMGEBUNG | [2020/50] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUSES FOR IMPLEMENTING SUPER COMMUNITY AND COMMUNITY SIDECHAINS WITH CONSENT MANAGEMENT FOR DISTRIBUTED LEDGER TECHNOLOGIES IN A CLOUD BASED COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS D'IMPLÉMENTATION DE CHAÎNES LATÉRALES DE SUPER-COMMUNAUTÉ ET DE COMMUNAUTÉ AVEC GESTION DU CONSENTEMENT POUR TECHNOLOGIES DE REGISTRE DISTRIBUÉ DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE EN NUAGE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 13.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - AZARIA ASAPH ET AL, "MedRec: Using Blockchain for Medical Data Access and Permission Management", 2016 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OPEN AND BIG DATA (OBD), IEEE, (20160822), doi:10.1109/OBD.2016.11, pages 25 - 30, XP032969608 [X] 1-23 * page 27 * * page 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/OBD.2016.11 | [X] - Joachim Sandgaard ET AL, "White Paper v1.1", (20171001), URL: https://www.medchain.global/doc/Medchain%20Whitepaper%20v1.1.pdf, (20190321), XP055572576 [X] 1-23 * page 10 * * page 10 * * page 12 * * page 12 * * page 12 * | [X] - GUY ZYSKIND ET AL, "Decentralizing Privacy: Using Blockchain to Protect Personal Data", 2015 IEEE SECURITY AND PRIVACY WORKSHOPS, (20150501), doi:10.1109/SPW.2015.27, ISBN 978-1-4799-9933-0, pages 180 - 184, XP055572435 [X] 1-23 * page 180, column 2 * * page 181, column 1 * * page 181, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPW.2015.27 | [I] - Philippe Genestier ET AL, "BLOCKCHAIN FOR CONSENT MANAGEMENT IN THE EHEALTH ENVIRONMENT: A NUGGET FOR PRIVACY AND SECURITY CHALLENGES", J Int Soc Telemed eHealth, JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR TELEMEDICINE AND EHEALTH, (20170101), pages 24 - 1, URL: https://journals.ukzn.ac.za/index.php/JISfTeH/article/view/269/pdf, (20190321), XP055572830 [I] 1-23 * page 2, column 1 * * page 2, column 2 - page 3, column 1 * | [I] - Kevin Peterson ET AL, "A Blockchain-Based Approach to Health Information Exchange Networks", (20160808), URL: http://kddlab.zjgsu.edu.cn:7200/research/blockchain/huyiyang-reference/A%20Blockchain-Based%20Approach%20to%20Health%20Information%20Exchange.pdf, (20190321), XP055572634 [I] 1-23 * page 3, paragraph 3.3 * * page 7, paragraph 3.7 - paragraph 3.8 * |