EP3762707 - OPTICAL DEVICE, OPTICAL MODULE AND MICROSCOPE FOR SCANNING LARGE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAHRBACH, Florian Eva-Hermann-Straße 21 68167 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KNEBEL, Werner Hebelstr. 17/1 76709 Kronau / DE | 03 /
POTT, Peter Erzbergstr. 46 68782 Brühl/Baden / DE | 04 /
FOUQUET, Wernher Verschaffeltstr. 26 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19707738.1 | 20.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019EP54146 | Priority number, date | DE201810203247 | 05.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018203247 | [2021/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019170413 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762707 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/47, G02B21/00, G01N21/64 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G02B21/0032 (US);
G01N21/47 (US);
G01N21/4795 (EP);
G02B21/0064 (US);
G02B21/0076 (EP,US);
G02B21/06 (EP);
G02B21/24 (EP,US);
G02B21/33 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG, OPTISCHES MODUL UND MIKROSKOP ZUM ABTASTEN GROSSER PROBEN | [2021/02] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICE, OPTICAL MODULE AND MICROSCOPE FOR SCANNING LARGE SAMPLES | [2021/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE, MODULE OPTIQUE ET MICROSCOPE POUR LE BALAYAGE D'ÉCHANTILLONS LARGES | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 05.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1136813 (WTW WEILHEIM [DE]); | [X]JP2004279910 (MASUJIMA TSUTOMU, et al); | [X]US2018052314 (BRINKMAN BRENDAN [US], et al) |