EP3613205 - SPRING-LOADED FALL PROTECTION FOR A MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/09] | SPRING-LOADED MEANS FOR PREVENTING A MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE FROM FALLING | ||
[2024/12] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frenzel + Mayer Solutions GBR 73430 Aalen / DE | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRENZEL, Philip Am Pfannenstiel 4 89564 Auernheim / DE | 02 /
MAYER, Peter Sophie-Scholl-Str. 5 73463 Westhausen / DE | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/46] | 01 /
FRENZEL, Philip Am Pfannenstiel 4 89564 Auernheim / DE | ||
02 /
MAYER, Peter Friedrichstr. 121 73430 Aalen / DE | Representative(s) | Raunecker, Klaus Peter Raunecker Patent Frauenstraße 11 89073 Ulm / DE | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 19708506.1 | 28.02.2019 | [2020/09] | WO2019EP55080 | Priority number, date | DE201810105199 | 07.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018105199 | [2020/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019170525 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613205 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3613205 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/18, H04M1/725, H04M1/72454 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04M1/185 (EP,US);
H04B1/3888 (US);
H04M1/72454 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | H04M1/18, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFEDERTE STURZSICHERUNG FÜR EIN MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2020/09] | English: | SPRING-LOADED FALL PROTECTION FOR A MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE | [2024/12] | French: | ANTICHUTE À RESSORT POUR UN TERMINAL MOBILE | [2024/12] |
Former [2020/09] | SPRING-LOADED MEANS FOR PREVENTING A MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE FROM FALLING | ||
Former [2020/09] | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES CHUTES À RESSORT CONÇU POUR UN TERMINAL MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 22.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US7059182 (RAGNER GARY DEAN [US]); | [XI]US2015331456 (MOON MINHYUNG KEVIN [US]); | [A]US2017155416 (LIU HAN-PIN [TW], et al) | by applicant | US7059182 | US9715257 |