EP3765452 - PREPARATIVE PROCESS OF TWO 4-{[(2S)-2-{4-[5-CHLORO-2-(1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHENYL]-5-METHOXY-2-OXOPYRIDIN-1(2H)-YL}BUTANOYL]AMINO}-2-FLUOROBENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGER, Julian Anton-Küppers-Weg 15 42855 Remscheid / DE | 02 /
GÖTZ, Daniel Martinstr. 46 40223 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
SOWA, Michal Kempers Häuschen 10 42109 Wuppertal / DE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 19708556.6 | 08.03.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019EP55815 | Priority number, date | EP20180161983 | 15.03.2018 Original published format: EP 18161983 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019175043 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765452 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3765452 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/10, C07C233/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C07D401/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (IL,KR);
A61P7/02 (KR);
C07C237/30 (IL,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Extension states | BA | 15.10.2020 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZWEI 4-{[(2S)-2-{4-[5-CHLOR-2-(1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHENYL]-5-METHOXY-2-OXOPYRIDIN-1(2H)-YL}BUTANOYL]AMINO}-2-FLUORBENZAMID-DERIVATEN | [2021/03] | English: | PREPARATIVE PROCESS OF TWO 4-{[(2S)-2-{4-[5-CHLORO-2-(1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHENYL]-5-METHOXY-2-OXOPYRIDIN-1(2H)-YL}BUTANOYL]AMINO}-2-FLUOROBENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES | [2021/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE DEUX DÉRIVÉS DE 4-{[(2S)-2-{4-[5-CHLORO-2-(1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHÉNYL]-5-MÉTHOXY-2-OXOPYRIDIN-1(2H)-YL}BUTANOYL]AMINO}-2-FLUOROBENZAMIDE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21169162.1 / EP3889147 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | SM | 13.04.2022 | |
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | GR | 14.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [IDA]WO2017005725 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE]) [ID] 16,17 * scheme 1, page 44; example 234 + example 235, pages 355-356; example 171 + example 242, pages 317, 318 and 360; claim 4 and 5 *[A] 1-15 | by applicant | WO2014154794 | WO2017005725 | - P. S. DRAGOVICH et al., J. Med. Chem., (20030000), vol. 46, page 4572 | - L. CHEN et al., Organic Process Research & Development, (20060000), vol. 10, page 838 | - A. S. GURAM et al., Organic Letters, (20060000), vol. 8, page 1787 | - H. RAPOPORT et al., J. Org. Chem.,, (19860000), vol. 51, page 1713 | - J. R. DUNETZ et al., Org. Lett., (20110000), vol. 13, page 5048 |