EP3753260 - DEVICE FOR TREATING A TINNITUS AFFLICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grübl, Klaus Laabstrasse 96 5280 Braunau/Inn / AT | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Birgitta, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Straße 11 1220 Wien / AT | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19708950.1 | 15.02.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019EP53766 | Priority number, date | AT20180050144 | 15.02.2018 Original published format: AT 501442018 | [2020/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019158674 | Date: | 22.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753260 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R25/00, A61F11/00, G02C11/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H04R1/105 (EP);
H04R25/75 (EP,US);
A61F11/00 (EP);
A61F11/14 (US);
A61F11/30 (US);
A61H7/001 (EP);
H04R25/65 (EP);
A61H2201/0192 (EP);
A61H2201/1246 (EP);
A61H2201/1604 (EP);
A61H2201/165 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES TINNITUS-LEIDENS | [2020/52] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING A TINNITUS AFFLICTION | [2020/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UN ACOUPHÈNE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 20.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2022/52] | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03142414 (MUNEKATA YUMIKO) [X] 1-3,13-16,18* the whole document *; | [X]JPH0956774 (SUDO KATSUO) [X] 1-3,15 * the whole document * |