EP3762963 - FINFET TECHNOLOGY USING DEEP ISOLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xilinx, Inc. 2100 Logic Drive San Jose, California 95124 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARP, James 2100 Logic Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 02 /
HART, Michael, J. 2100 Logic Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19709594.6 | 14.02.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US18067 | Priority number, date | US201815917206 | 09.03.2018 Original published format: US201815917206 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173033 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762963 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8238, H01L21/762, H01L27/092 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
H01L27/0921 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/823878 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0649 (US);
H01L21/76224 (US);
H01L21/76229 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/823821 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/0924 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66795 (US);
H01L29/785 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | FINFET-TECHNOLOGIE MIT TIEFENISOLIERUNG | [2021/02] | English: | FINFET TECHNOLOGY USING DEEP ISOLATION | [2021/02] | French: | TECHNOLOGIE FINFET UTILISANT UNE ISOLATION PROFONDE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 09.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4683488 (LEE WILLIAM W Y [US], et al); | [XYI]US2008029821 (YAMAGAMI SHIGEHARU [JP], et al); | [XY]US2015060959 (LIN YI-TANG [TW], et al); | [IY]US2015311201 (JU JIANHUA [CN], et al) |