EP3765654 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING A SURFACE OF AT LEAST ONE LARGE-FORMAT COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAG, Bertram Tragelhöchstädt 12 91486 Uehlfeld / DE | 02 /
MUSAYEV, Yashar Kölnerstr. 11a 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
HECKL, Astrid Michaelstr. 52g 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
JAKOB, Christian Nelkenstrasse 2 97535 Wasserlosen / DE | 05 /
PODGAYNYY, Nikolay Am Alten Bahnhof 17 91325 Adelsdorf / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19709619.1 | 18.02.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019DE100149 | Priority number, date | DE201810105966 | 15.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018105966 | [2021/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174666 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765654 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/00, B05C1/00, B05C3/00, B05C3/02, B05D1/18, C23C22/77, C23C22/73, F16C33/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C23C22/00 (EP,KR);
B05C3/005 (US);
C23C22/73 (EP,KR);
C23C22/77 (EP,KR,US);
B05D1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN EINER OBERFLÄCHE MINDESTENS EINES GROßFORMATIGEN BAUTEILS | [2021/03] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING A SURFACE OF AT LEAST ONE LARGE-FORMAT COMPONENT | [2021/03] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE D'AU MOINS UNE PIÈCE DE GRAND FORMAT | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |