EP3918035 - METHOD FOR THE CONVERSION OF FEEDSTOCK CONTAINING NAPHTHA TO LOW CARBON OLEFINS AND AROMATICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | For all designated states Dalian Institute Of Chemical Physics, Chinese Academy Of Sciences 457 Zhongshan Road Dalian Liaoning 116023 / CN | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Yinfeng 457 Zhongshan Road Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | 02 /
YE, Mao 457 Zhongshan Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Zhongmin 457 Zhongshan Road Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Hailong 457 Zhongshan Road Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Jing 457 Zhongshan Road Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Jinling 457 Zhongshan Road Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Tao 457 Zhongshan Road Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | 08 /
AL-SHAMMARI, Talal Khaled SABIC T&I PO Box 42503 Riyadh, 11551 / SA | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
ZHAO, Yinfeng Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | ||
02 /
YE, Mao Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | |||
03 /
LIU, Zhongmin Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | |||
04 /
TANG, Hailong Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | |||
05 /
WANG, Jing Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | |||
06 /
ZHANG, Jinling Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Tao Dalian, Liaoning 116023 / CN | |||
08 /
AL-SHAMMARI, Talal Khaled Riyadh, 11551 / SA | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19710128.0 | 28.01.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019IB50689 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020157540 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918035 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (US);
B01J35/50 (US);
C07C4/06 (US);
C07C4/10 (US);
C07C4/12 (US);
C10G2300/104 (EP);
C10G2300/1044 (EP,US);
C10G2300/301 (US);
C10G2300/4006 (US);
C10G2300/4012 (US);
C10G2300/4018 (US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US);
C10G2400/30 (EP,US);
C10G35/00 (US);
C10G45/58 (US);
C10G59/00 (US);
C10G61/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON ROHSTOFFEN MIT NAPHTHA IN KOHLENSTOFFARME OLEFINE UND AROMATEN | [2021/49] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CONVERSION OF FEEDSTOCK CONTAINING NAPHTHA TO LOW CARBON OLEFINS AND AROMATICS | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE CHARGE D'ALIMENTATION CONTENANT DU NAPHTA EN OLÉFINES À FAIBLE TENEUR EN CARBONE ET EN COMPOSÉS AROMATIQUES | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008156696 (NICCUM PHILLIP K [US], et al); | [A]CN102286294 ; | [A]US2016369189 (WARD ANDREW MARK [GB], et al); |