EP3909113 - ELECTRICAL SHEET FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRICAL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUH, Carsten Heideweg 9 85598 Baldham / DE | 02 /
VOLLMER, Rolf Espenlaubstraße 13 36129 Gersfeld / DE | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
SCHUH, Carsten 85598 Baldham / DE | ||
02 /
VOLLMER, Rolf 36129 Gersfeld / DE | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 19710348.4 | 04.03.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019EP55297 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020177853 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909113 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3909113 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/22, H02K15/02, H02K1/20 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
H02K1/20 (EP,US);
H02K9/197 (US);
H02K1/16 (US);
H02K15/02 (EP);
H02K9/225 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | H02K1/20, H02K9/20, H02K15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROBLECH FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN ELEKTROBLECH | [2021/46] | English: | ELECTRICAL SHEET FOR AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRICAL SHEET | [2021/46] | French: | TÔLE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TÔLE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 09.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NL | 26.04.2023 | |
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NL | 26.04.2023 | |
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | NL | 26.04.2023 | |
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102011109129 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | [XAY]DE102014004613 (GROSCHOPP AG DRIVES & MORE [DE]) | Examination | DE102014004613 |