EP3768636 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AN AQUEOUS HYDROGEN PEROXIDE SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY SA Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLIER, Juan-Teva rue des Fonds, 13 5140 Sombreffe / BE | 02 /
DOURNEL, Pierre Rue Joseph Coosemans, 13 1030 Brussels / BE | 03 /
LORENT, Karol 95, rue Aubry 7110 Strépy-Bracquegnies / BE | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19710432.6 | 19.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019EP56761 | Priority number, date | EP20180162441 | 19.03.2018 Original published format: EP 18162441 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179973 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768636 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3768636 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/023 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C01B15/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN WASSERSTOFFPEROXIDLÖSUNG | [2021/04] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AN AQUEOUS HYDROGEN PEROXIDE SOLUTION | [2021/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE DE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/04] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE PDE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGÈNE | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 01.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 14.06.2023 | |
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2018686 (DEUTSCHE GOLD- UND SILBER SCHEIDEANSTALT) [A] 1-14* claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4349526 (GOOR GUSTAAF, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * claims 1,2,11-13 *; | [A]US4394369 (RANBOM WAYNE) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 34-53 * * column 2, lines 3-17 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 3 *; | [A]EP0286610 (EKA NOBEL AB [SE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-49 * * page 2, lines 4-6, 12-15, 28-30, 42-46 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4803063 (PRALUS CHRISTIAN [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 15-35 * * claims 1,5-7 * | by applicant | US2158525 | US2215883 | GB841323 | US3617219 | EP0529723 | EP0965562 | JP2004099541 | WO2010139728 | WO2015049327 | EP3052439 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 64742-94-5 | - SHIVE et al., JACS, (19420000), vol. 64, pages 385 - 389 | - DISCHINO et al., J. Labelled Cpd. Radiopharm., (19990000), vol. 42, pages 965 - 974 | EP20180162441 |