EP3749576 - APPARATUS FOR DEVICE CHARGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFPL Group Limited Elm Lane Calbourne, Isle of Wight PO30 4JY / GB | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, John Michael Elm Lane Newport, Isle of Wight PO30 4JY / GB | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19710464.9 | 07.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019GB50337 | Priority number, date | GB20180002017 | 07.02.2018 Original published format: GB 201802017 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019155219 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749576 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, G06F21/35, H04B5/00, H04B7/185, B64D11/06 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
H04B5/77 (EP);
H02J7/02 (GB);
G06F21/35 (EP,US);
B64D11/0015 (EP);
B64D11/0624 (EP,US);
H04B5/72 (EP,GB);
H04B5/79 (EP,US);
G06F21/33 (US);
G06F21/44 (US);
G06F21/76 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN EINES GERÄTES | [2020/51] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DEVICE CHARGING | [2020/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHARGEMENT DE DISPOSITIF | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 03.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2023 | 29.02.2024 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP2106141 (INFLIGHT INVEST INC [CA]) [X] 1,4-9 * figures 1,2,6 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * claim 8 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US2014253021 (LUKE HOK-SUM HORACE [US], et al) [Y] 3* paragraph [0086] *; | [Y]US2015358052 (MUIRHEAD ANDREW [DE]) [Y] 2 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0051] * |