EP3740583 - SYNTHESIS OF GLUCAN COMPRISING ALPHA-1,3 GLYCOSIDIC LINKAGES WITH PHOSPHORYLASE ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danisco US Inc. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Zheyong 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
KRALJ, Slavko Dupont Nutrition Biosciences APS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen / DK | 03 /
ZHANG, Zhenghong 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 04 /
HOWE, Laurie A. 102 Grove Mansion Way Bear, Delaware 19709 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2020/48] | 01 /
YU, Zheyong 10, Lane 280, Lin Hong Road Shanghai 200335 / CN | ||
02 /
KRALJ, Slavko Dupont Nutrition Biosciences APS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen / DK | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Zhenghong 10, Lane 280, Lin Hong Road Shanghai 200335 / CN | |||
04 /
HOWE, Laurie A. 102 Grove Mansion Way Bear, Delaware 19709 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19710525.7 | 21.02.2019 | [2020/48] | WO2019US18939 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN77004 | 23.02.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/077004 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019165060 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740583 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04, C12P19/18, C12N9/10 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
C12P19/04 (EP,US);
C12P19/08 (US);
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
C12P19/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON GLUCAN MIT GLYCOSIDISCHEN ALPHA-1,3-BINDUNGEN MIT PHOSPHORYLASE-ENZYMEN | [2020/48] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF GLUCAN COMPRISING ALPHA-1,3 GLYCOSIDIC LINKAGES WITH PHOSPHORYLASE ENZYMES | [2020/48] | French: | SYNTHÈSE DE GLUCANE COMPRENANT DES LIAISONS GLYCOSIDIQUES ALPHA-1,3 AVEC DES ENZYMES PHOSPHORYLASE | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 06.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2021 | Decision despatched | 29.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI] - NIHIRA, T. ET AL., "Characterization of Two alpha-1,3-Glucoside Phosphorylases from Clostridium phytofermentans", JOURNAL OF APPLIED GLYCOSCIENCE, (2014), vol. 61, pages 59 - 66, XP002791754 [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * abstract * * page 61, column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 3 * * page 63, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 28; table 3 * * page 64, column 2, line 15 - column 1, line 19; figures 3, 4 * [A] 11,13 [I] 5,10,14-17 | [AD] - ANON., "glycoside hydrolase", GenPept, (20141224), Database accession no. WP_036646618, XP002791762 [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - LUCAS, S. ET AL., "Full=Glycoside hydrolase family 65 central catalytic", UniProt, (20171122), Database accession no. E4Q9G1, XP002791721 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - VAN DER BORGHT, J. ET AL., "Enzymatic production of beta-D-glucose-1-phosphate from trehalose", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 5, pages 986 - 993, XP002791756 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.201000203 | by applicant | US5565341 | US5807719 | US5843748 | US5939308 | US5965412 | US5993889 | US2002068349 | WO2005003343 | US7000000 | US2010284972 | US2013302857 | US2015232819 | WO2015183714 | US2016122445 | US2016136199 | WO2017079595 | WO2017091533 | US2017154996 | US2017218093 | US2017282385 | - SIMPSON et al., Microbiology, (19950000), vol. 141, pages 1451 - 1460 | - CANTAREL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20090000), vol. 37, pages D233 - 238 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, CABIOS, (19890000), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153 | - HIGGINS, D.G. et al., Comput. Appl. Biosci., (19920000), vol. 8, pages 189 - 191 | - THOMPSON, J.D. et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19940000), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - ADRIO; DEMAIN, Biomolecules, (20140000), vol. 4, pages 117 - 139 | - VOGTENTANZ et al., Protein Expr. Purif., (20070000), vol. 55, pages 40 - 52 | WO2018CN77004 |