EP3768626 - SPRUNG LIFTING DEVICE FOR A CRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Werk Biberach GmbH Memminger Str. 120 88400 Biberach an der Riss / DE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄNSLER, Andreas Dietenwenger Weg 2 88436 Eberhardzell / DE | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19711331.9 | 14.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019EP56391 | Priority number, date | DE201810106729 | 21.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018106729 | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179870 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768626 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/34, B66C1/40, B66D3/04 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
B66C1/34 (EP,US);
B66C1/40 (EP,US);
B66D3/04 (EP,US);
B66C1/36 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | GEFEDERTE HEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN KRAN | [2021/04] | English: | SPRUNG LIFTING DEVICE FOR A CRANE | [2021/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE À RESSORT POUR GRUE | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 07.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Observations by third parties | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US1713586 (WILLIAM WRIGHT) [Y] 2,3,9 * figures 1-3 * * 37: stem * * 40: barrel * * 42: cup * * 43: compression spring * * 50: hook * [A] 1; | [XYI]DE2133813 (SIEMAG TRANSLIFT GMBH) [X] 1,10 * siehe die ausführliche Beschreibung, ab Mitte der Seite 4 bis Seite 9, Seile 8 * * 4: Seiltrommel * * 19: Feder * * 23, 31 & 37: Hydraulikzylinder * * 42: Druckmittelzylinder * * figures 1, 3-8 * [Y] 2,3,6,9 [I] 4,8; | [A]US4112750 (MURAKAMI SAKAE) [A] 1,7 * abstract ** figure - *; | [YA]FR2414192 (CHARLET SA [FR]) [Y] 2,3,6,9 * siehe die ausführliche Beschreibung, die Seiten 5 bis 9 * * 17: rondelles élastiques * * figure - * [A] 1,7; | [YA]CN204138162U (TAIYUAN HEAVY INDUSTRY CO LTD) [Y] 2,3,9 * siehe die Übersetzung der ausführlichen Beschreibung * * figure 1 * * 6: spring * [A] 1; | [YA]CN107458960 (JIA YULIANG) [Y] 2,3,9 * siehe die Übersetzung der ausführlichen Beschreibung * * figure 1 * * 4: compression spring * * 6: guide rod * * 12: supporting plate * * 1: hook body * [A] 1; | [A]CN107500171 (WUHU YANGTZE RIVER LIFTING EQUIPMENT MFT CO LTD) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 * * 8: spring * | other | GB190224244 | US3512657 | US3621756 | US3792787 | US3894476 | US7980610 | WO2014098568 |