EP3758871 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING MACHINE COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF POWDER ONTO A MOBILE SURFACE USING VIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AddUp Zone Industrielle de Ladoux 13-33 Rue Verte 63118 Cébazat / FR | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Addup 5 Rue Bleue Zone Industrielle de Ladoux 63118 Cebazat / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLAVAN, Cédric AddUp 5 rue Bleue Zone Industrielle de Ladoux 63118 Cebazat / FR | 02 /
WALRAND, Gilles AddUp 5 rue Bleue Zone Industrielle de Ladoux 63118 Cebazat / FR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Barascou, Frédéric Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19711990.2 | 25.02.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019FR50427 | Priority number, date | FR20180051809 | 01.03.2018 Original published format: FR 1851809 | [2021/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019166727 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758871 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3758871 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/28, B33Y30/00, B29C64/321, B22F12/52, B22F12/57, B29C64/205, B29C64/255, B22F3/105, // B22F12/37, B33Y10/00, B33Y40/00, B22F12/90, B29C64/153 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B33Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,KR,US);
B22F12/37 (EP,KR,US);
B22F12/38 (KR);
B22F12/52 (EP,KR,US);
B22F12/57 (EP,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/205 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/227 (KR,US);
B29C64/245 (KR,US);
B29C64/25 (US);
B29C64/255 (EP,US);
B29C64/268 (KR,US);
B29C64/321 (EP);
B29C64/343 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,KR);
B33Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F12/50, B22F2202/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | B22F3/105, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00, B29C64/321 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERTEILEN VON PULVER AUF EINER MOBILEN OBERFLÄCHE MITTELS VIBRATION | [2021/01] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING MACHINE COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF POWDER ONTO A MOBILE SURFACE USING VIBRATION | [2021/01] | French: | MACHINE DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE POUDRE PAR VIBRATIONS SUR UNE SURFACE MOBILE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 01.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3091368 (SIDNEY HARLEY ROBERT, et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, lines 35-45 * * figure 1 *; | [YD]WO2017108868 (FIVES MICHELIN ADDITIVE SOLUTIONS [FR]) [YD] 1-12 * page 5, line 20 - page 9, line 11 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A] - Dietmar Schulze ET AL, "Sections 12.2 to 12.3.2.5", Powders and Bulk Solids: Behavior, Characterization, Storage and Flow, ISBN 978-3-540-73767-4, (20071201), pages 347 - 363, URL: https://www.springer.com/gp/book/9783540737674, (20181018), XP055516931 [A] 1-12 * section 12.3.2.5 * | [A] - DUNST P ET AL, "Analysis of pipe vibration in an ultrasonic powder transportation system", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20170629), vol. 263, doi:10.1016/J.SNA.2017.05.050, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 733 - 736, XP085181863 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2017.05.050 | by applicant | WO2017108868 |