EP3762729 - GENETIC MARKER AND/OR BIOMARKERS FOR TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY, AND ULTRASENSITIVE ASSAYS FOR BIOMARKERS OF TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meso Scale Technologies, LLC 1601 Research Boulevard Rockville, MD 20850 / US | For all designated states GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY 37th and O Streets, N.W. Washington, DC 20057 / US | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | For all designated states Debad, Jeff 262 Fountain Green Lane Unit 100 Gaithersburg MD 20878 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATSON, Joshua 7524 Cresswell Drive Arlington, Texas 76001 / US | 02 /
BURNS, Mark 6404 Little Leigh Ct. Cabin John, Maryland 20818 / US | 03 /
BIESSO, Arianna 9199 Carriage House Ln Columbia, Maryland 21045 / US | 04 /
DEBAD, Jeff 262 Fountain Green Lane, Unit 100 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Gabriella Diana, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19712465.4 | 08.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US21333 | Priority number, date | US201862640220P | 08.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862640220 P | US201862666328P | 03.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862666328 P | US201862672263P | 16.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862672263 P | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019173703 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3762729 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, B01L3/00, G01N21/66, G01N35/02 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP);
G01N33/5308 (US);
B01L3/5085 (EP);
G01N21/66 (US);
G01N35/02 (US);
G01N2201/0484 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | GENETISCHE MARKER- UND/ODER BIOMARKER FÜR TRAUMATISCHE HIRNVERLETZUNG UND ULTRAEMPFINDLICHE TESTS FÜR BIOMARKER VON TRAUMATISCHEN HIRNVERLETZUNGEN | [2021/02] | English: | GENETIC MARKER AND/OR BIOMARKERS FOR TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY, AND ULTRASENSITIVE ASSAYS FOR BIOMARKERS OF TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY | [2021/02] | French: | MARQUEURS ET/OU BIOMARQUEURS GÉNÉTIQUES POUR LÉSION CÉRÉBRALE TRAUMATIQUE, ET DOSAGES ULTRASENSIBLES POUR BIOMARQUEURS DE LÉSION CÉRÉBRALE TRAUMATIQUE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 29.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP24180409.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015140127 (RAMIREZ SERVIO H [US], et al); | by applicant | US4168146 | US4235601 | US4366241 | US4442204 | US5208535 | US5807522 | WO9926067 | US6110426 | US2003113713 | US2003207290 | US2004022677 | WO2004058055 | US2004189311 | US2005052646 | US2005142033 | US6977772 | US2006205012 | US2011201099 | US2014272939 | WO2015175856 |