EP3763170 - BACKING UP A LOAD CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lutron Technology Company LLC 7200 Suter Road Coopersburg, PA 18036 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGHURAM, Sandeep Mudabail 7200 Suter Road Coopersburg, Pennsylvania 18036 / US | 02 /
VENDOLA, Philip J. 7200 Suter Road Coopersburg, Pennsylvania 18036 / US | 03 /
BANERJEE, Agniva 7200 Suter Road Coopersburg, Pennsylvania 18036 / US | 04 /
KARMANI, Ashok 7200 Suter Road Coopersburg, Pennsylvania 18036 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 19712480.3 | 08.03.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019US21423 | Priority number, date | US201862640390P | 08.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862640390 P | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019173757 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3763170 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, G06F11/14, H04L12/28, H04L29/08 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G06F11/1461 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/2803 (CN,US);
G06F11/1464 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/122 (US);
H04L67/025 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1001 (US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H05B45/30 (CN);
H05B47/19 (EP,CN,US);
H05B47/199 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Title | German: | SICHERUNG EINES LASTSTEUERUNGSSYSTEMS | [2021/02] | English: | BACKING UP A LOAD CONTROL SYSTEM | [2021/02] | French: | SAUVEGARDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE DE CHARGE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 08.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US8296410 (MYHILL ROBERT [US], et al); | [X]US2013198137 (MILLER GAROLD C [US], et al); | [XYI]US8775377 (ZHANG SHUANGMIN [CN], et al) | by applicant | US5248919 | US8009042 | US8199010 | US8228184 | US2013030589 | US8410706 | US8451116 | US8471779 | US2014132475 | US9413171 |