EP3768948 - TURBOMACHINE WITH TILTABLE CASING PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/04] | TURBOMACHINE WITH TILTABLE HOUSING PART | ||
[2022/25] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISENMENGER, Nadja Burgherrenstrasse 17 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
DOEHRING, Jochen Muenchinger Str. 34 A 70439 Stuttgart-Stammheim / DE | 03 /
DAIMER, Guido Keltenweg 6 71686 Remseck / DE | 04 /
TRAUTMANN, Juliane Ob Der Linde 8 71665 Vaihingen / DE | 05 /
PECHINGER, Markus Martin-Luther-Strasse 41 70372 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
SCHOEFER, Joerg Blumenstr. 26 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 07 /
FOERSTER, Felix Muehlackerstrasse 39 75433 Maulbronn / DE | 08 /
MAYER, Michael Hutteneichenweg 20 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 19712528.9 | 13.03.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019EP56240 | Priority number, date | DE201810204289 | 21.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018204289 | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179843 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768948 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01D3/04, F01D5/04 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
F01D3/04 (EP);
F01D5/048 (EP);
F01D5/043 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINE MIT KIPPBAREM GEHÄUSETEIL | [2021/04] | English: | TURBOMACHINE WITH TILTABLE CASING PART | [2022/25] | French: | TURBOMACHINE COMPRENANT UNE PARTIE DE BOÎTIER INCLINABLE | [2022/25] |
Former [2021/04] | TURBOMACHINE WITH TILTABLE HOUSING PART | ||
Former [2021/04] | TURBOMACHINE À ÉLÉMENT DE BOÎTIER INCLINABLE | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 21.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10003018 (ATLAS COPCO ENERGAS [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraph [0002] *; | [XA]DE102006049516 (ATLAS COPCO ENERGAS [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * [A] 3,4,9,10; | [A]EP2060804 (BURGMANN AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] *; | [A]EP2420651 (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] *; | [XA]WO2017146977 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] * [A] 3,4,8-10; | [XA]DE102016210782 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * [A] 3,4 | by applicant | DE102014226951 |