EP3774368 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A PATTERN OF MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/07] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A MATERIAL PATTERN | ||
[2023/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerosint SA Rue d'Abhooz 31 4040 Herstal / BE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICK, Matthias Place Saint-Georges 56 4830 Limbourg / BE | 02 /
ECKES, Kevin Rue Paul Segers 12 1040 Etterbeek / BE | 03 /
GUILLAUME, Colin Rue de Gaët 11 1320 L'Ecluse / BE | 04 /
DEBLIRE, Antoine Rue Louis et Jeanne Albert 7 4367 Crisnée / BE | 05 /
MOENS DE HASE, Charles-Edouard Rue Gustave Renier 11 4300 Waremme / BE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 19712780.6 | 26.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019EP57583 | Priority number, date | BE20180005210 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: BE 201805210 | EP20180164492 | 28.03.2018 Original published format: EP 18164492 | [2021/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019185626 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774368 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/12, B22F3/00, B29C64/205, B29C64/141, B33Y30/00, B33Y10/00, B41M5/025, B41M3/00, B22F10/18, B22F10/47, B22F12/55, B29C64/112, B29C64/209 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/18 (EP,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,US);
B22F12/55 (EP,US);
B22F3/004 (EP);
B29C64/112 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | B41M1/12, B41M3/00, B41M5/025, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B29C64/141, B29C64/205 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDUNG EINES MATERIALMUSTERS | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A PATTERN OF MATERIAL | [2023/27] | French: | MÉTHODE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FORMER UN MOTIF DE MATIÈRE | [2021/07] |
Former [2021/07] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MATERIALMUSTERS | ||
Former [2021/07] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A MATERIAL PATTERN | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 25.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5767877 (MEI PING [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-15 * column 1, line 30 - line 32 * * column 2, line 24 - line 30 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 56 * * figures 1, 2, 8, 9 * [I] 5,6; | [A]US2017197365 (SUGIYAMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | US5767877 | WO2017EP71039 |