EP3788638 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFYING SUBJECTS BASED ON TIME SERIES PHENOTYPIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 0JB / GB | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLIFTON, David Andrew 20 Ouseley Close Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 0JS / GB | 02 /
FARAJIDAVAR, Nazli 4 Rivercourt Trinity Street Oxford Oxfordshire OX1 1TQ / GB | 03 /
ZHU, Tingting 28 Alan Bullock Close Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 1AU / GB | 04 /
DING, Xiaorong 85 Cherwell Drive Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 0ND / GB | 05 /
WATKINSON, Peter 341 Woodstock Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 7NX / GB | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19713133.7 | 12.03.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019GB50683 | Priority number, date | GB20180007307 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: GB 201807307 | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019211575 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788638 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, G16H50/70 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/021 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/0816 (US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/14542 (US);
A61B5/163 (US);
A61B5/4824 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N7/01 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H50/70 (EP,US);
A61B2503/40 (US);
G01N33/4925 (US);
G16H50/30 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KLASSIFIKATION VON SUBJEKTEN AUF DER GRUNDLAGE VON PHÄNOTYPISCHEN ZEITREIHENDATEN | [2021/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFYING SUBJECTS BASED ON TIME SERIES PHENOTYPIC DATA | [2021/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CLASSIFIER DES SUJETS SUR LA BASE DE DONNÉES PHÉNOTYPIQUES DE SÉRIES CHRONOLOGIQUES | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 05.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2017228507 (BOTTINGER ERWIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,12-14,21-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0028] - [0033] - [0036] , [0037] , [0042] - [0045] * [I] 5,7,8,11,15-20,24; | [Y] - HENSMAN JAMES ET AL, "Fast Nonparametric Clustering of Structured Time-Series", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2014.2318711, ISSN 0162-8828, (20150201), pages 383 - 393, (20150107), XP011569103 [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * page 383, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * Sections 3.1 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2014.2318711 | [Y] - IAN C. MCDOWELL ET AL, "Clustering gene expression time series data using an infinite Gaussian process mixture model", PLOS COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY, (20180116), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pcbi.1005896, page e1005896, XP055596675 [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * page 3/27, paragraph 4 * * page 5/27, paragraphs 2,5 * * page 6/27, paragraph 4 * * page 13/27, paragraph 3 * * page 15/27, paragraph 4 - page 19/27, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pcbi.1005896 | [Y] - PETER SCHULAM ET AL, "Disease Trajectory Maps", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160629), XP080707917 [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * section 2 * | [A] - Nakul Gopalan, "Gaussian Process Latent Variable Models for Dimensionality Reduction and Time Series Modeling", (20120101), URL: https://www.ias.informatik.tu-darmstadt.de/uploads/Teaching/RobotLearningSeminar/Goppalan_RLS_2012.pdf, (20190614), XP055596689 [A] 7,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | - H. GAO; A. MCDONNELL; D. A. HARRISON; T. MOORE; S. ADAM; K. DALY; L. ESMONDE; D. R. GOLDHILL; G. J. PARRY; A. RASHIDIAN et al., "Systematic review and evaluation of physiological track and trigger warning systems for identifying at-risk patients on the ward", Intensive care medicine, (20070000), vol. 33, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1007/s00134-007-0532-3, pages 667 - 679, XP019510868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00134-007-0532-3 | - L. TARASSENKO; A. HANN; D. YOUNG, "Integrated monitoring and analysis for early warning of patient deterioration", British Journal of Anaesthesia, (20060000), vol. 97, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1093/bja/ael113, pages 64 - 68, XP055192692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bja/ael113 | - L. CLIFTON; D. A. CLIFTON; M. A. PIMENTEL; P. J. WATKINSON; L. TARASSENKO, "Gaussian processes for personalized e-health monitoring with wearable sensors", IEEE Transactions on Biomedical Engineering, (20130000), vol. 60, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/TBME.2012.2208459, pages 193 - 197, XP011490325 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2012.2208459 | - PEDREGOSA, "Scikit-learn: Machine Learning in Python", Journal of Machine Learning Research, (20110000), vol. 12, pages 2825 - 2830 | - STREHL, ALEXANDER; JOYDEEP GHOSH, "Cluster ensembles - a knowledge reuse framework for combining multiple partitions", Journal of Machine Learning Research, (20020000), vol. 3, pages 583 - 617, XP055163691 | - J. HENSMAN; M. RATTRAY; N. D. LAWRENCE, "Fast Nonparametric Clustering of Structured Time-Series", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20150200), vol. 37, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2014.2318711, pages 383 - 393, XP011569103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2014.2318711 |